Global Patent Index - EP 1265581 A1

EP 1265581 A1 2002-12-18 - CAPSULES FILLING MACHINE TO PACK POWDER, HERBS, MICROGRANULES, PELLETS

Title (en)

CAPSULES FILLING MACHINE TO PACK POWDER, HERBS, MICROGRANULES, PELLETS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABFÜLLEN VON PULVER, HEILKRÄUTER, GRANULATEN ODER PELLETS IN KAPSELN

Title (fr)

REMPLISSEUSE DE CAPSULES UTILISEE POUR CONDITIONNER DE LA POUDRE, DES HERBES, DES MICRO-GRANULES OU DES PASTILLES

Publication

EP 1265581 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00911154 A

Priority

IB 0000341 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0170171A1] A capsule filling machine in which the products to be filled inside the capsules are fed hermetically from the inside of the rotating tower and are pushed in the withdrawal area of the dosing devices by the centrifugal force. The layer of the product to be packed, in the withdrawal peripherical area, has a minimum height and it allows packing even minimum product quantities. While working, the dosing devices are always immersed in the withdrawal peripherical layer and they do not come out from it even during the discharging phase.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61J 3/07; B65B 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 3/07 (2006.01); B65B 1/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 1/385 (2013.01); A61J 3/074 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0170171A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0170171 A1 20010927; AU 3314800 A 20011003; EP 1265581 A1 20021218

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070222

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050922

2006-03-15 [111L] LICENCES

- Free text: 0100 A.M.R.P. HANDELS AG

- Effective date: 20051201

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020917

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI