Global Patent Index - EP 1265720 A1

EP 1265720 A1 2002-12-18 - PAIR OF GRABS, IN PARTICULAR OF A TRANSVERSAL TRANSPORT DEVICE IN MULTIPLE-DIE PRESSES

Title (en)

PAIR OF GRABS, IN PARTICULAR OF A TRANSVERSAL TRANSPORT DEVICE IN MULTIPLE-DIE PRESSES

Title (de)

GREIFERPAAR, INSBESONDERE EINER QUERFÖRDERVORRICHTUNG AN MEHRSTUFENPRESSEN

Title (fr)

PAIRE DE GRIFFES, NOTAMMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT TRANSVERSAL SUR UNE PRESSE A PLUSIEURS ETAGES

Publication

EP 1265720 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01911754 A

Priority

  • DE 10014851 A
  • EP 0102611 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0172445A1] The invention relates to a pair of grabs, in particular of a transversal transport device in multiple-die presses, comprising a grab (10) that receives the workpiece (14) to be pressed and a grab (20) that retains said workpiece. The invention aims to prevent the axis of symmetry (12) of the workpiece (14) held by the grabs from being shifted laterally during the axial displacement of said workpiece by the pair of grabs (10-20). To achieve this, the pair of grabs that can be positioned on a plane of movement which is cut perpendicularly by the axis of symmetry is configured in such a way that the receiving grab has two fingers (10.1 and 10.2), (spread by at least 60 DEG ), which together with the single finger (20.1) of the retaining grab, form an intermediate space for the workpiece in the shape of an isosceles triangle (3x60 DEG ). Said intermediate space can be modified into geometrically similar intermediate spaces by simultaneous, uniform, linear movements of the two grabs in mirror image to a plane of symmetry (15) which is perpendicular to the plane of movement and contains the axis of symmetry.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 43/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 43/05 (2006.01); B21K 27/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 43/055 (2013.01); B21K 27/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0172445A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0172445 A1 20011004; WO 0172445 A8 20020221; DE 10014851 C1 20010927; DK 1265720 T3 20040216; EP 1265720 A1 20021218; EP 1265720 B1 20031029

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070308

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-10-30 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-04-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050426

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-03-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050324

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-03-14 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050314

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-03-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050311

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-10-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-07-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-02-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100876 P 20031204

2003-11-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2003-11-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR IT LI

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR