Global Patent Index - EP 1265723 A2

EP 1265723 A2 2002-12-18 - MACHINE REAMER AND REAMING HEAD FOR A MACHINE REAMER

Title (en)

MACHINE REAMER AND REAMING HEAD FOR A MACHINE REAMER

Title (de)

MASCHINENREIBAHLE UND REIBKOPF FÜR EINE MASCHINENREIBAHLE

Title (fr)

ALESOIR A MACHINE ET TETE POUR ALESOIR A MACHINE

Publication

EP 1265723 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01911518 A

Priority

  • DE 10009721 A
  • EP 0100730 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10009721A1] The remaining head consists of a one-piece variable cutter head (12) clamped and self-centered in a radially expandable endface plate. The cutter plate (12) has an extension (24) projecting axially off a rear ground face (22). The extension has at least three equi-spaced wedge faces (26) to make up an axi-central truncated pyramid. The ground face in turn has three bevel faces complementing the pyramid faces (26), the bevel faces in turn bounded by an endface ground surface as axially abutted by the ground face at the cutter face (12) endface. The plate seat has three equi-spaced bevel-faced clamping straps spaced by axially and/or radially open parting gaps arranged so the strap endfaces span the plane forming the ground face bounding the complementary bevel surfaces specified. The wedge surfaces (26) are set at 5-10 deg relative the main body axis, as compared with the smaller angle setting of the complementary wedge surfaces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23D 77/00; B23B 29/03; B23C 5/10; B23C 5/18; B23C 5/20; B23C 5/26; B23D 77/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23D 77/00 (2006.01); B23B 29/03 (2006.01); B23C 5/10 (2006.01); B23C 5/18 (2006.01); B23C 5/20 (2006.01); B23C 5/26 (2006.01); B23D 77/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B23D 77/02 (2013.01); B23C 5/10 (2013.01); B23D 77/006 (2013.01); B23C 2210/03 (2013.01); Y10S 408/713 (2013.01); Y10T 279/16 (2013.01); Y10T 408/455 (2013.01); Y10T 408/90993 (2013.01); Y10T 408/95 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0164381A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10009721 A1 20010906; AU 4053501 A 20010912; BR 0108859 A 20030429; CA 2401245 A1 20010907; CN 1404425 A 20030319; EP 1265723 A2 20021218; EP 1265723 B1 20121114; IL 151366 A 20061210; IL 151366 D0 20030410; JP 2003525137 A 20030826; JP 4831912 B2 20111207; MX PA02008566 A 20040823; US 2003143044 A1 20030731; US 6896450 B2 20050524; WO 0164381 A2 20010907; WO 0164381 A3 20020221

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130124

2015-06-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121114

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130124

2014-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 583680 T

- Effective date: 20130124

2014-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130124

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130214

2013-12-12 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50116199

- Effective date: 20130815

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130930

2013-10-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130815

2013-10-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130214

2013-10-23 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2013-08-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121114

2013-08-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121114

2013-08-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KOMET GROUP G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121114

2013-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130314

2013-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130215

2013-05-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121114

2013-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121114

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121114

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130225

2013-04-10 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20121114

2013-01-10 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50116199

- Effective date: 20130110

2012-12-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2012-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2012-11-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 583680 T

- Effective date: 20121115

2012-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2012-11-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2012-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B23D 77/02 20060101ALI20120613BHEP

2012-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B23B 29/03 20060101ALI20120613BHEP

2012-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B23C 5/26 20060101ALI20120613BHEP

2012-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B23C 5/18 20060101ALI20120613BHEP

2012-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B23C 5/10 20060101ALI20120613BHEP

2012-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B23C 5/20 20060101ALI20120613BHEP

2012-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B23D 77/00 20060101AFI20120613BHEP

2009-09-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOMET GROUP GMBH

2007-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040504

2005-01-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOMET GROUP HOLDING GMBH

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040504

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020725

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI