Global Patent Index - EP 1265730 A1

EP 1265730 A1 2002-12-18 - TOOL, IN PARTICULAR, A CLEANING AND APPLICATION TOOL, COMPRISING A SHAFT AND A HANDLE

Title (en)

TOOL, IN PARTICULAR, A CLEANING AND APPLICATION TOOL, COMPRISING A SHAFT AND A HANDLE

Title (de)

ARBEITSGERÄT, INSBESONDERE REINIGUNGS- UND APPLIKATIONSGERÄT, MIT EINEM STIEL UND EINEM GRIFFELEMENT

Title (fr)

OUTIL, PLUS PRECISEMENT OUTIL D'APPLICATION ET DE NETTOYAGE, COMPOSE D'UN MANCHE ET D'UNE POIGNEE

Publication

EP 1265730 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01927766 A

Priority

  • DE 10014047 A
  • EP 0103202 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0170466A1] The invention relates to a tool comprising an, in particular, tubular shaft (1) and a handle for a user's hand (5). Said handle can be fixed in various axial positions and/or radial positions on the shaft and is provided essentially in the form of a closed sleeve (6). The sleeve stores a manually actuatable clamping piece (8) that can be adjusted between a clamping position, in which the handle engages with the shaft in a non-positive manner, and a disengaging position, in which a relative movement between the handle and shaft is permitted. According to the invention, the clamping piece, in the clamping position thereof, verges with its outer surface into the outer surface of the sleeve in an essentially flush manner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25G 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25G 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25G 1/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0170466A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0170466 A1 20010927; AU 5471301 A 20011003; DE 10014047 A1 20010927; EP 1265730 A1 20021218; EP 1265730 B1 20050518; ES 2243484 T3 20051201; MX PA02008640 A 20030327

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090321

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090323

2010-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090323

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080329

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080318

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-02-15 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-05-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060221

2006-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2243484 T3

2005-06-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50106256 P 20050623

2005-06-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020821

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT