Global Patent Index - EP 1265742 A1

EP 1265742 A1 2002-12-18 - LOW-DENSITY INJECTION-MOLDED BODY COMPONENTS

Title (en)

LOW-DENSITY INJECTION-MOLDED BODY COMPONENTS

Title (de)

SPRITZGEGOSSENE KAROSSERIEBAUTEILE MIT GERINGER DICHTE

Title (fr)

ELEMENTS DE CARROSSERIE DE FAIBLE DENSITE MOULES PAR INJECTION

Publication

EP 1265742 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01914453 A

Priority

  • US 0105851 W
  • US 18474300 P
  • US 18463900 P
  • US 18456400 P
  • US 26491601 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0162486A1] The present invention provides a co-injection molded, multiphase vehicle component having a microsphere enhanced region, as well as a method for constructing such a vehicle component. The vehicle component has an outer portion or phase that is formed by first injecting a preselected quantity of a desired thermoplastic material into a preselected mold (402) in a manner to achieve a first layer of the thermoplastic material in a cavity of the mold. Then, a microsphere enhanced inner portion or phase is formed by injection of a micrsophere enhanced core material (404) to fill a remaining portion of the cavity. The resulting vehicle component typically has a lower density, and thus a lower weight, is generally less costly, and maintains the desired strength by selection of suitable microspheres, typically substantially hollow, and a suitable proportion of microspheres per unit volume of core material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B32B 3/00; B32B 3/26; B32B 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 45/00 (2006.01); B29C 45/16 (2006.01); B29C 45/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 45/0025 (2013.01); B29C 45/0013 (2013.01); B29C 45/1642 (2013.01); B29C 45/1704 (2013.01); B29C 45/0005 (2013.01); B29C 2045/1707 (2013.01); B29C 2045/1723 (2013.01); B29K 2105/12 (2013.01); B29K 2105/16 (2013.01); B29L 2031/3005 (2013.01); B29L 2031/3044 (2013.01); B29L 2031/3055 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0162486 A1 20010830; CA 2393938 A1 20020830; CA 2393938 C 20110614; CA 2397236 A1 20010830; CA 2397751 A1 20010830; DE 60139605 D1 20091001; EP 1257411 A1 20021120; EP 1257411 A4 20030507; EP 1257411 B1 20090819; EP 1263574 A1 20021211; EP 1263574 A4 20030502; EP 1263574 B1 20160518; EP 1265742 A1 20021218; EP 1265742 A4 20030507; WO 0162479 A1 20010830; WO 0162488 A1 20010830; WO 0162488 A8 20011129; WO 0162488 A9 20021024

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060901

2004-12-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB

2003-05-07 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 29C 45/16 A

2003-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60R 19/03 B

2003-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 29C 45/00 B

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR