Global Patent Index - EP 1266129 A1

EP 1266129 A1 2002-12-18 - FASTENING OF THE BLADES OF A COMPRESSION MACHINE

Title (en)

FASTENING OF THE BLADES OF A COMPRESSION MACHINE

Title (de)

BEFESTIGUNG DER BESCHAUFELUNG EINER STRÖMUNGSMASCHINE

Title (fr)

FIXATION D'AUBES SUR UNE TURBOMACHINE

Publication

EP 1266129 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01914106 A

Priority

  • DE 10014189 A
  • IB 0100441 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0171165A1] According to the invention, the blades (1, 11, 12, 13, 1n) of a turbine or of a compressor are fastened inside a groove (8) on the rotor (6) or stator of the turbine or compressor by means of blade bases (4), whereby no play or a pretensioning prevails between the base plate (3) and/or the blade base (4). In addition, adjacent blades (1, 11, 12, 13, 1n) are reciprocally supported in this manner against torsional moments (12) and not or only negligibly on the rotor (6) or stator. This is made possible, for example, by the provision of a beveling (9).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/22 (2006.01); F01D 5/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/3023 (2013.01); F01D 5/225 (2013.01); F05D 2260/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0171165A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0171165 A1 20010927; AU 3948501 A 20011003; CN 1313708 C 20070502; CN 1423725 A 20030611; CZ 20023152 A3 20030618; CZ 298200 B6 20070718; DE 10014189 A1 20010927; EE 04689 B1 20060815; EE 200200542 A 20040415; EP 1266129 A1 20021218; EP 1266129 B1 20041222; PL 199066 B1 20080829; PL 357310 A1 20040726; RU 2311537 C2 20071127; UA 73765 C2 20030115; US 2003143077 A1 20030731; US 6830435 B2 20041214

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090322

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090322

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-01-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090323

2010-01-06 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090322

2009-10-26 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20090322

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080321

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080320

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-05-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20080321

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050318

2005-01-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50104883 P 20050127

2005-01-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: LT LV RO

2004-12-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020907

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT PAYMENT 20020907;LV PAYMENT 20020907;MK;RO PAYMENT 20020907;SI