Global Patent Index - EP 1266147 A1

EP 1266147 A1 2002-12-18 - FLUIDIC SYSTEM WITH A SAFETY FUNCTION

Title (en)

FLUIDIC SYSTEM WITH A SAFETY FUNCTION

Title (de)

FLUIDTECHNISCHES SYSTEM MIT SICHERHEITSFUNKTION

Title (fr)

SYSTEME FLUIDIQUE A FONCTION DE SECURITE

Publication

EP 1266147 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01923550 A

Priority

  • DE 10006367 A
  • EP 0100624 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0159307A1] The invention concerns a fluidic system for safety-oriented control, in addition to a fluidic actuator, a local control device for a fluidic system and a software module for a local control device of a fluidic system. The invention also concerns a method for operating a fluidic system. The fluidic actuator (10) is controlled by control means (30) of a local control device (50). A sensor (16, 17, 27, 41, 42) transmits information on the operating state of the fluidic system to the local control device (50). To this end, the local control device (50) detects on the basis of said information whether a safety-critical state exists and optionally carries out a given follow-up action. The safety-oriented functions are integrated into the fluidic system so that it can be used as a prefabricated unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 20/00; F15B 19/00; G05B 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 21/02 (2006.01); F15B 19/00 (2006.01); F15B 20/00 (2006.01); G05D 16/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 19/005 (2013.01); F15B 20/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0159307A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0159307 A1 20010816; AT 290654 T 20050315; DE 10006367 A1 20010816; EP 1266147 A1 20021218; EP 1266147 B1 20050309; JP 2003522909 A 20030729; US 2003010198 A1 20030116; US 6769250 B2 20040803

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160120

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160120

2016-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160120

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150131

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150131

2015-08-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150115

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140120

2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 290654 T

- Effective date: 20140120

2014-08-20 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130121

2013-09-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-08-26 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130109

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130116

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20120125

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120116

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-11-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100120

2010-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FESTO A.G. & CO.

- Effective date: 20100131

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-02-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20081218

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050309

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050309

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051212

2006-01-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-10-19 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-09-07 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050907

2005-06-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050620

2005-06-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-04-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50105536 P 20050414

2005-04-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-04-04 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-03-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050309

2005-03-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2005-03-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-03-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-09 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050309

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030606

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020725

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR