Global Patent Index - EP 1266283 A1

EP 1266283 A1 2002-12-18 - DYNAMIC APPLICATION BROWSER AND DATABASE FOR USE THEREWITH

Title (en)

DYNAMIC APPLICATION BROWSER AND DATABASE FOR USE THEREWITH

Title (de)

DYNAMISCHER ANWENDUNGS-BROWSER UND DATENBANK ZUR VERWENDUNG DAMIT

Title (fr)

NAVIGATEUR DE RECHERCHE DYNAMIQUE D'APPLICATIONS ET BASE DE DONNEES A CET EFFET

Publication

EP 1266283 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99967210 A

Priority

US 9928894 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO02059741A1] A dynamic application browser is provided that handles multiple applications and allows for the seamless exchange of information from one computer to another is described. The dynamic application browser is run on a first computer including a database that stores a plurality of objects. The browser also includes an update module that uploads and downloads objects from a second computer and a database manager. The database manager controls storage of, and access to, the objects stored in the at least one database and interfaces with the update module and the at least one database. The at least one database includes at least one table storing at least one of the plurality of objects.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/445 (2006.01); G06F 11/00 (2006.01); G06F 9/44 (2006.01); G06F 12/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 8/65 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 02059741 A1 20020801; CA 2397620 A1 20020801; CA 2397620 C 20091117; EP 1266283 A1 20021218; EP 1266283 A4 20060621; JP 2004518215 A 20040617

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121127

2010-12-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANCILE SOLUTIONS, INC.

2008-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RWD TECHNOLOGIES, LLC

2007-07-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RWD TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-06-21 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060516

2006-06-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 9/445 20060101AFI20060511BHEP

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020705

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI