Global Patent Index - EP 1266328 A1

EP 1266328 A1 2002-12-18 - DISALLOW PAYMENT FOR E-BILLING SYSTEM

Title (en)

DISALLOW PAYMENT FOR E-BILLING SYSTEM

Title (de)

UNTERBINDEN EINER BEZAHLUNG FÜR EIN E-GEBÜHREN-SYSTEM

Title (fr)

REFUS DE PAIEMENT POUR SYSTEME DE FACTURATION ELECTRONIQUE

Publication

EP 1266328 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01916643 A

Priority

  • US 0108114 W
  • US 18922500 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0169502A1] A payment disallow mechanism for an e-billing system (100) including a computer system (200) accessible for on-line interactive communication of invoices to users. The computer system including a database for storing customer invoice information, the information including an invoice date and a total invoice amount for display to said customer for on-line interaction; a mechanism for initiating electronic payment of the modified total invoice amount via the e-billing system, and a mechanism for determining whether the total invoice amount is a zero balance or credit balance prior to executing the electronic payment, wherein in response to determination of the zero or credit balance, the mechanism terminating the payment mechanism and generating a disallow payment message for display to the customer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0169502 A1 20010920; WO 0169502 A9 20030116; AU 4364101 A 20010924; CA 2402775 A1 20010920; EP 1266328 A1 20021218; EP 1266328 A4 20040602; JP 2003527697 A 20030916; MX PA02009038 A 20030624

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-08-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DISALLOW PAYMENT FOR E-BILLING SYSTEM

2004-06-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040419

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021011

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI