Global Patent Index - EP 1266331 A4

EP 1266331 A4 2003-06-25 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR USING AN EXPERT SYSTEM TO EXECUTE BUSINESS TRANSACTION DOCUMENTS TO FACILITATE ELECTRONIC COMMERCE

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR USING AN EXPERT SYSTEM TO EXECUTE BUSINESS TRANSACTION DOCUMENTS TO FACILITATE ELECTRONIC COMMERCE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG EINES EXPERTENSYSTEMS ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG VON GESCHÄFTS-TRANSAKTIONSDOKUMENTEN, UM DEN ELEKTRONISCHEN KOMMERZ ZU ERLEICHTERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL QUI, POUR FACILITER LE COMMERCE ELECTRONIQUE, UTILISENT UN SYSTEME EXPERT POUR L'EXECUTION DE DOCUMENTS DE TRANSACTION COMMERCIALE

Publication

EP 1266331 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 01920513 A

Priority

  • US 0108717 W
  • US 53418000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0173650A1] A method and system is described for electronic commerce system enabling corporations to transact business over the Internet or Value Added Networks. The expert system allows businesses to transact business without regard for disparate internal systems and disparate supplier and logistical systems. An expert system, method and apparatus which consists of an input manager (200) to normalize incoming documents and an inference engine (400) that contains a dynamic decision template manager (410) that allocated templates to documents based on the prevailing environment. The inference engine executes the template based on a dynamic node engine (420) and the node execution manager (440). They execute the decision template (430) based on traversing the decision template and executing a conditional branch or passing the execution to the task manager. The task manager identifies the appropriate data source to manipulate and passes the result back to the node execution manager.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 6006242 A 19991221 - POOLE DONALD L [US], et al
  • [X] US 5043891 A 19910827 - GOLDSTEIN HENRY [US], et al
  • [E] EP 1122652 A1 20010808 - MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]
  • [X] BRYAN M: "Guidelines for using XML for electronic data interchange", PROCEEDINGS OF SGML/XML EUROPE. FROM THEORY TO NEW PRACTICES, XX, XX, 17 May 1998 (1998-05-17), pages 523 - 548, XP002180775
  • [X] ANONYMOUS: "Bluestone XML-Server: First Application Server To Recognize XML as a Data Type", INTERNET ARTICLE. WHITE PAPER. NC.FOCUS., April 1999 (1999-04-01), XP002239450, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://spectral.mscs.mu.edu/XMLClass/Materials/0499XMLWhitePaper.pdf> [retrieved on 20030425]
  • [X] LALLEMANT Y AND FOX M S: "IntelliServe: Automating Customer Service", PROCEEDINGS AIEC99 . AI FOR ELECTRONIC COMMERCE, 18 July 1998 (1998-07-18), Orlando, Florida, XP002239451, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.cs.umbc.edu/aiec/papers/fox.pdf> [retrieved on 20030425]
  • [A] KRISTENSEN A: "Template resolution in XML/HTML", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 30, no. 1-7, 1 April 1998 (1998-04-01), pages 239 - 249, XP004121423, ISSN: 0169-7552
  • See also references of WO 0173650A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0173650 A1 20011004; AU 4755901 A 20011008; CA 2403652 A1 20011004; EP 1266331 A1 20021218; EP 1266331 A4 20030625; NZ 521427 A 20050527

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061003

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031020

2003-06-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030513

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROYAL, GREGORY, T.

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020924

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI