Global Patent Index - EP 1266342 A1

EP 1266342 A1 2002-12-18 - SCANNER UTILIZING LIGHT PIPE WITH DIFFUSER

Title (en)

SCANNER UTILIZING LIGHT PIPE WITH DIFFUSER

Title (de)

SCANNER MIT EINEM LICHTLEITER MIT DIFFUSOR

Title (fr)

LECTEUR OPTIQUE A FIBRE OPTIQUE EQUIPEE D'UN DIFFUSEUR

Publication

EP 1266342 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01911199 A

Priority

  • US 0106399 W
  • US 51724000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0165469A1] A scanner that can include a light source (3810) emitting light through a light pipe (3820) to a detector array. The light pipe can include a reflective surface (3822) and a diffuser (3824). The reflective surface can reflect light (3815), directly or indirectly towards the diffuser and the diffuser can diffuse the light out of the light pipe. The light pipe can further include a reflective groove that reflects ligth from the reflective surface towards the diffuser. The diffuser can diffuse the light to an object that reflects the light to the detector array. The object may be a bar code, paper money, or any other object that can be scanned. The diffuser may be a variable diffuser.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 7/10; G06K 7/00; G06K 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 27/00 (2006.01); G03H 1/04 (2006.01); G03H 1/22 (2006.01); G06K 7/10 (2006.01); G06K 19/06 (2006.01); H01L 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 7/10742 (2013.01); G06K 7/10722 (2013.01); G06K 7/10732 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0165469 A1 20010907; AU 3871501 A 20010912; CA 2406616 A1 20010907; CA 2406616 C 20100928; CA 2708355 A1 20010907; CA 2708355 C 20120529; CN 1327383 C 20070718; CN 1426570 A 20030625; EP 1266342 A1 20021218; EP 1266342 A4 20050330; JP 2003525472 A 20030826; KR 100933386 B1 20091222; KR 20020081382 A 20021026; TW 501359 B 20020901

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060907

2005-03-30 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050211

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06K 7/10 A

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06K 7/14 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06K 7/00 B

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020920

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI