Global Patent Index - EP 1266451 A1

EP 1266451 A1 2002-12-18 - METHOD FOR LOCATING AND SETTING A CHANNEL IN A COMMUNICATIONS TERMINAL

Title (en)

METHOD FOR LOCATING AND SETTING A CHANNEL IN A COMMUNICATIONS TERMINAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR SENDERSUCHE UND SENDEREINSTELLUNG IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT WOBEI DIE DATEN BEZÜGLICH DEN EMPFANGSFREQUENZEN VOM INTERNET GELADEN WERDEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE RECHERCHER ET DE REGLER UN CANAL DANS UN TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION

Publication

EP 1266451 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01915090 A

Priority

  • DE 0100862 W
  • DE 10014521 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0171912A1] The invention relates to a method for locating and setting a channel in a telecommunications terminal comprising a radio and/or a television receiver. According to said method, available channels are located and set in the radio and/or television receiver. The invention is characterized in that the channel is automatically located and set using the Internet, whereby the telecommunications terminal is connected to the Internet and the available channel is downloaded to the radio and/or the television receiver.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03J 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03J 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03J 1/0075 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0171912A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0171912 A1 20010927; CN 1419741 A 20030521; DE 10014521 A1 20010927; EP 1266451 A1 20021218

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070828

2007-12-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2007-11-14 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A.

2007-09-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2007-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051222

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020903

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR