Global Patent Index - EP 1266582 A1

EP 1266582 A1 2002-12-18 - Machine for filling cigarette tubes with improved retention in closed position

Title (en)

Machine for filling cigarette tubes with improved retention in closed position

Title (de)

Stopfeinrichtung für Zigarettenhülsen mit verbesserter Halterung in geschlossenem Zustand

Title (fr)

Machine à garnir des tubes de cigarettes à maintien amélioré en position fermée

Publication

EP 1266582 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02291442 A

Priority

FR 0107790 A

Abstract (en)

The hand held cigarette making machine has a sleeve (120) to form the tobacco into a rod and a casing (110) to support a cigarette paper tube. the casing is mounted on a slide (200) which can move along the sleeve. There is a cap (300) to close onto the sleeve and with interlocking catches (265,365) to hold the cap closed. The catches are movable in a transverse direction to the sleeve.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24C 5/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1266582 A1 20021218; FR 2825900 A1 20021220; FR 2825900 B1 20031212

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060512

2005-03-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050131

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030610

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI