Global Patent Index - EP 1266602 A1

EP 1266602 A1 2002-12-18 - Basket for dish-washing machine

Title (en)

Basket for dish-washing machine

Title (de)

Geschirrkorb für Geschirrspülmaschine

Title (fr)

Panier pour lave-vaisselle

Publication

EP 1266602 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01830385 A

Priority

EP 01830385 A

Abstract (en)

The invention concerns a basket for dish-washing machines, comprising a body (11) of metal wire in which four vertical walls (A, B, C, D) and a horizontal bottom (E) are defined, and in which a first plurality of rounded projections (13, 14) is defined on at least one of said vertical walls, which projections are directed towards the basket interior, are intended to hold the plates and co-operate with as many rounded projections (15, 16, 17, 19) provided on the basket bottom (E). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1266602 A1 20021218; EP 1266602 B1 20041201; DE 60107552 D1 20050105

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-08 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20060702

2006-01-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-11-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: AEG HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60107552 P 20050105

2004-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-12-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-11-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WIRE INDUSTRIES S.P.A.

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030524

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI