Global Patent Index - EP 1266675 A1

EP 1266675 A1 2002-12-18 - Device for suspending hoses

Title (en)

Device for suspending hoses

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Aufhängen von Schläuchen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour suspendre des tuyaux

Publication

EP 1266675 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02013024 A

Priority

DE 10128560 A

Abstract (en)

The tubes (10) are lifted and deposited by their end section (12) in a holder (11) so that each tube hangs freely. The container (2) has a passage (8) at least double the wall thickness of the tubing. A first outer surface (13) of the tubing's end section is placed against the end part of the tubing's end section. The holder has a cavity (17) for a second outer surface (15) of the tubing and differing from the first outer surface.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung (1) zum vorübergehenden Aufhängen von Schläuchen (10). Die Vorrichtung (1) hat eine an einem Aufzug angeordnete, gabelförmige Aufnahme (2), wobei die von einem Randbereich (14) eingeschlossene Durchbrechung (8) auf eine erste Außenfläche (13) des Schlauches (10) abgestimmt ist. Die Übergabe an eine beispielsweise an der Decke befestigte Halterung (11) erfolgt anschließend, indem die Aufnahme (2) mitsamt dem an seinem Endabschnitt (12) formschlüssig fixierten Schlauch (10) durch eine Aussparung (17) der Halterung (2) abgesenkt wird. Dabei gelangt der Endabschnitt (12) mit seiner zweiten Außenfläche (15) auf einen Randbereich (16) der Aussparung (17), wobei der Schlauch (10) selbsttätig von der Aufnahme (2) getrennt wird und diese anschließend seitlich heraus bewegt werden kann. Durch diese Ausführung der Aufnahme (2) kann auf die Verwendung von Adaptern verzichtet werden, wodurch die Handhabung und die Betriebssicherheit der Vorrichtung (1) wesentlich verbessert werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 33/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 33/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 33/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1266675 A1 20021218; DE 10128560 C1 20030508

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081028

2007-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071106

2003-10-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR IT

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030407

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI