Global Patent Index - EP 1266707 A1

EP 1266707 A1 2002-12-18 - Vacuum valve for pressure diecasting machine

Title (en)

Vacuum valve for pressure diecasting machine

Title (de)

Vakuumventil für eine Druckgiessmaschine

Title (fr)

Clapet à vide pour machine de coulée sous pression

Publication

EP 1266707 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01810571 A

Priority

EP 01810571 A

Abstract (en)

Vacuum valve is arranged between a hollow chamber (18) of a die casting machine and a suction channel (32) connected to the chamber. The valve has a control rod (38) which moves in the axial direction (x). A valve head (40) sits on one end of the rod to close the valve and a plunger (44) is arranged on the other end. The plunger protrudes into a cylinder chamber (46) impinged with a gas pressure and slides in the axial direction in the chamber. The plunger is subjected to a closing force on its end facing away from the cylinder chamber using a spring element. An Independent claim is also included for a die casting machine. Preferred Features: Closable openings (52) are provided for ventilating the cylinder chamber. The openings are arranged in the base of the cylinder chamber.

Abstract (de)

Zum Evakuieren des Formhohlraumes einer Druckgiessmaschine ist wenigstens ein Vakuumventil (30) zwischen dem Formhohlraum und einem mit dem Formhohlraum in Verbindung stehenden Saugkanal (32) angeordnet. Das Vakuumventil (30) weist eine in axialer Richtung (x) verschiebbare Steuerungsstange (38) auf, an deren einem Ende ein Ventilkopf (40) sitzt, der zum Schliessen des Ventils (30) mittels der verschiebbaren Steuerungsstange (38) einem Ventilsitz (42) gasdicht anlegbar ist. Am anderen Ende der Steuerungsstange (38) ist ein Kolben (44) angeordnet, der in einen mit Gasdruck beaufschlagbaren Zylinderraum (46) einragt und in diesem in axialer Richtung (x) gleitend verschiebbar ist. Der Kolben (44) ist an seinem dem Zylinderraum (46) abgewandten Ende mittels eines Federelementes (58) mit einer auf den Ventilkopf (40) wirkenden Schliesskraft beaufschlagbar. Mit dem Vakuumventil kann die Verschlusszeit auf weniger als 1 ms verkürzt werden. Das Vakuum kann während des Giessvorganges länger aufrecht erhalten werden, wodurch im Gussstück weniger Gaseinschlüsse auftreten und sich damit eine geringere Porosität ergibt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 17/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/145 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1266707 A1 20021218; WO 02100573 A1 20021219

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [R18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-10-29 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-10-15 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-10 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030618

- Countries: SI

2003-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030618

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI