Global Patent Index - EP 1266757 A2

EP 1266757 A2 2002-12-18 - Unit for decorating ceramic products

Title (en)

Unit for decorating ceramic products

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Dekoration von keramischen Gegenständen

Title (fr)

Unité pour la décoration d'articles en céramique

Publication

EP 1266757 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02011877 A

Priority

IT BO20010340 A

Abstract (en)

In a unit for decorating groups (5) of ceramic products (2), each group (5), defined by at least one product (2), is fed through a decorating station (12), where the group (5) is decorated by a decorating member (13) having a number of holes (22), which define patterns (3) to be applied to the products (2), and through which a decorating material is fed; the decorating member (13) being a flexible member movable along an endless path (P2). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 11/00 (2006.01); B28B 11/04 (2006.01); B41F 15/08 (2006.01); B41F 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 15/0809 (2013.01); B28B 11/001 (2013.01); B28B 11/04 (2013.01); B28B 11/047 (2013.01); B41F 17/00 (2013.01); B41P 2215/56 (2013.01); B41P 2217/56 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1266757 A2 20021218; EP 1266757 A3 20030219; EP 1266757 B1 20071219; DE 60224134 D1 20080131; DE 60224134 T2 20081204; ES 2298308 T3 20080516; IT BO20010340 A1 20021129; IT BO20010340 D0 20010529

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090528

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090529

2010-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090529

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2008-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080922

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080516

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2298308 T3

2008-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60224134 P 20080131

2007-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2003-11-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2003-10-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-02-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-02-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41F 17/00 A

2003-02-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41F 15/08 B

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI