EP 1266762 A3 20031022 - Method and apparatus for controlling a heating element of a thermal head
Title (en)
Method and apparatus for controlling a heating element of a thermal head
Title (de)
Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung eines Heizelementes in einem Thermokopf
Title (fr)
Méthode et appareil de contrôle d'un élément chauffant d'une tête thermique
Publication
Application
Priority
JP 2001180233 A 20010614
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1266762A2] A control apparatus for controlling a heating element of a thermal head (10) has a print data processing unit (40) and a drive control circuit (50). The print data processing unit (40) has a first processing function for converting first color data to first and second print data, a second processing function for converting second color data to second print data, a first line buffer (43) for storing the first print data, and a second line buffer (44) for storing the first and the second print data. The print data processing unit (40) selectively outputs print data from the first line buffer (43) or print data from the second line buffer (44) to the drive control circuit. The drive control circuit (50) has a print buffer (52) and history buffer (53), and energizes the heating elements of the thermal head (10) based on energizing commands determined by a comparison of the content of the print buffer (52) with that of the history buffer (53). <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B41J 2/355 (2006.01); B41J 2/36 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR)
B41J 2/355 (2013.01 - KR); B41J 2/3555 (2013.01 - EP); B41J 2/36 (2013.01 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [A] US 5376952 A 19941227 - KOKUBO HIDEYUKI [JP], et al
- [A] EP 1070593 A2 20010124 - SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]
- [A] US 5625394 A 19970429 - FUKUDA HIROSHI [JP], et al
- [PA] US 6342911 B1 20020129 - MORIYA BUNJI [JP]
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 09 13 October 2000 (2000-10-13)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 20 10 July 2001 (2001-07-10)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 055 (M - 362) 9 March 1985 (1985-03-09)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1266762 A2 20021218; EP 1266762 A3 20031022; EP 1266762 B1 20051123; AT E310643 T1 20051215; DE 60207488 D1 20051229; DE 60207488 T2 20060727; ES 2248448 T3 20060316; HK 1052901 A1 20040130; HK 1052901 B 20050520; JP 2008213489 A 20080918; JP 4596036 B2 20101208; KR 100530648 B1 20051122; KR 20020095439 A 20021226
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 02013169 A 20020614; AT 02013169 T 20020614; DE 60207488 T 20020614; ES 02013169 T 20020614; HK 03105073 A 20030714; JP 2008117071 A 20080428; KR 20020032750 A 20020612