Global Patent Index - EP 1266828 A1

EP 1266828 A1 2002-12-18 - Method and apparatus for wrapping stacks of articles in a stretchable foil cover or sleeve

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for wrapping stacks of articles in a stretchable foil cover or sleeve

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Umhüllen von Stückguteinheiten mit einer hauben- oder Schlauchförmigen Stretchfolienumhüllung

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour envelopper des piles de marchandises avec une housse ou un manchon de film étirable

Publication

EP 1266828 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02004253 A

Priority

  • DE 20109692 U
  • DE 10163728 A

Abstract (en)

Device for surrounding a load has a roller (14) arranged in a hook (1) in the horizontal moving path of the roller (13) on the upper edge section (17). Preferred Features: The roller is arranged in the known manner central to the hook and/or the roller (14). The roller (14) has the cross-section of the edge section of the hook. The roller (14) can be reversibly driven.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Umhüllen von Stückguteinheiten (1) mit jeweils einer aus Kunststoff bestehenden hauben- oder schlauchförmigen Stretchfolienumhüllung (2), deren Umfang im ungedehnten Ausgangszustand kleiner als im quergestretchten Umhüllungszustand ist, bei dem der freie untere Randabschnitt der der jeweils zu umhüllenden Stückguteinheit (1) zugeführten Umhüllungsfolie (2) von mehreren bügelförmig ausgebildeten Multifunktionselementen ("Bügeln") (3) aufgenommen und aufgespreizt wird, die Folie (2) durch reversierbar antreibbare Reffrollen (7) auf die Bügel (3) aufgerefft wird, von diesen horizontal quergestretcht wird, und im quergestretchten (Überzieh-) Zustand über die Stückguteinheit (1) gezogen wird, wobei die von den Bügeln (3) quergestretchte und von den im Gegensinne zum Aufreffen angetriebenen Reffrollen (7) i.w. mittig an die Bügel (3) angedrückte Umhüllungsfolie (2) beim Überziehen über die Stückguteinheit (1) fluchtend oberhalb jeder Reffrolle (7) gesteuert bis zum oberen Bügelrand (15') bewegt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 9/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/135 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1266829 A1 20021218; EP 1266829 B1 20041201; EP 1266829 B9 20050406; AT 283794 T 20041215; DE 10208339 A1 20021219; DE 50201655 D1 20050105; DE 50202970 D1 20050609; DK 1266828 T3 20050905; DK 1266829 T3 20050411; EP 1266828 A1 20021218; EP 1266828 B1 20050504; ES 2233726 T3 20050616; ES 2240588 T3 20051016

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2016-03-31 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2016-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151030

2015-09-21 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50202970

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140224

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140220

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140218

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140220

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-08-29 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-04-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060207

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2240588 T3

2005-09-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50202970 P 20050609

2005-06-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR IT

2005-03-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR IT

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030805

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030129

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI