Global Patent Index - EP 1266831 A2

EP 1266831 A2 2002-12-18 - Method and device for wrapping a bouquet

Title (en)

Method and device for wrapping a bouquet

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verpacken eines Blumenstrausses

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif d'emballage d'un bouquet de fleurs

Publication

EP 1266831 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02077357 A

Priority

NL 1018277 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a method for packing bunches of flowers (43), comprising of providing a supply of sleeves (3) of foil material, opening a sleeve (3), placing a bunch of flowers (43) in the opened sleeve (3) and discharging the bunch of flowers (43) packed into the sleeve (3). According to the invention the sleeve (3) is engaged before the sleeve (3) is opened. The invention also relates to an apparatus (1) for packing bunches of flowers (43), comprising a frame (4), a holder (2) for a supply of sleeves (3) of foil material, opening means (17,18,32) for opening the sleeve (3) and discharge means (49) for packed bunches of flowers (43). According to the invention the opening means (17,18,32) comprise at least one engaging means for a sleeve (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 25/02; B65B 43/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/02 (2006.01); B65B 43/30 (2006.01); B65B 43/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 43/36 (2013.01); B65B 25/023 (2013.01); B65B 43/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1266831 A2 20021218; EP 1266831 A3 20030305; NL 1018277 C1 20021216

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050104

2003-11-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030902

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI