Global Patent Index - EP 1266853 A2

EP 1266853 A2 2002-12-18 - Apparatus for transporting sheets leaving punching/pressing machine

Title (en)

Apparatus for transporting sheets leaving punching/pressing machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Transport von aus einer Stanz-/Pressvorrichtung kommenden Bögen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de transport de feuilles à la sortie d'une machine à poinçonner/presser

Publication

EP 1266853 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02077193 A

Priority

IT MI20011239 A

Abstract (en)

Apparatus for transporting sheets (1) from a storage unit (20) to a stacker (30), which comprises a support surface (11) provided with means (111) for transporting said sheets (1), which surface is movable translationwise from a position close to the storage device (20), where the sheets (1) are picked up, to a position close to the stacker (30), where the sheets are unloaded. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/36 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42264 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1266853 A2 20021218; EP 1266853 A3 20040428; IT MI20011239 A1 20021212; IT MI20011239 D0 20010612

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060621

2005-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-01-19 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20041018

- Countries: LT

2005-01-19 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20041018

- Countries: RO

2005-01-19 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20041018

- Countries: SI

2004-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041018

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 29/36 A

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI