Global Patent Index - EP 1266855 A2

EP 1266855 A2 2002-12-18 - Mark transfer tool and mark transfer tape

Title (en)

Mark transfer tool and mark transfer tape

Title (de)

Musterübertragungsgerät und Musterübertragungsband

Title (fr)

Appareil de transfert de motifs et bande de transfert de motifs

Publication

EP 1266855 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02250797 A

Priority

JP 2001149950 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002170683A1] A mark transfer tool making use of a coat film transfer technology about various marks composed of characters, codes, patterns or their combination. A mark transfer tape is composed of pressure-sensitive adhesive transfer marks disposed and held on the surface of a base tape continuously and peelably at specific intervals. Therefore, various marks can be used in a completely different method from the conventional mode of impressing use in the form of a stamp or adhering use in the form of a mark seal and the like, so that diversified preferences of general users can be satisfied effectively.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B43L 19/00 (2006.01); B41F 17/00 (2006.01); B44C 1/17 (2006.01); B65C 11/00 (2006.01); B65H 37/00 (2006.01); C09J 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 37/007 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1788 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1795 (2013.01); Y10T 156/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

US 2002170683 A1 20021121; AU 4062302 A 20021121; CA 2369919 A1 20020918; CN 100340461 C 20071003; CN 1386691 A 20021225; EP 1266855 A2 20021218; EP 1266855 A3 20030129; JP 2002337830 A 20021127; KR 20020089125 A 20021129; TW 568842 B 20040101

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100119

2009-10-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090907

2009-09-11 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1049322

2003-10-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI