EP 1266971 A3 20030115 - Operation method of moving hearth furnace
Title (en)
Operation method of moving hearth furnace
Title (de)
Betriebsverfahren für Drehherdofen
Title (fr)
Procédé d'opération pour four à sole tournante
Publication
Application
Priority
JP 2001176249 A 20010611
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1266971A2] An operation method of a moving hearth furnace, in which a reduced metal is obtained by reducing by heating a metal oxide loaded into the moving hearth furnace, includes the steps of supplying and burning a fuel including combustible wastes as a heat source for the operation. According to the operation method of a moving hearth furnace, the resources can be used effectively and costs can be reduced by using industrial wastes as a fuel.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
C21B 13/00 (2006.01); C21B 13/10 (2006.01); F27B 9/16 (2006.01); F27B 9/36 (2006.01); F27D 7/02 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
C21B 13/0066 (2013.01 - EP US); C21B 13/10 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [X] DE 2935103 A1 19810312 - ESTERMANN THOMAS M
- [A] DE 1231273 B 19661229 - DEMAG ELEKTROMETALLURGIE GMBH
- [A] DE 19541673 A1 19960829 - KRUPP AG HOESCH KRUPP [DE], et al
- [A] DE 19520651 A1 19961212 - FUENDERS DIETER DR ING [DE]
- [A] DE 3320951 A1 19841213 - MINDERMANN FRITZ DR RER NAT
- [A] DE 2923726 B1 19801204 - MINDERMANN FRITZ DR RER NAT
- [A] DE 2935544 A1 19810319 - MINDERMANN FRITZ DR RER NAT
- [A] US 5824134 A 19981020 - POWERS JIM [US]
- [A] US 3998606 A 19761221 - MIYASHITA TSUNEO, et al
- [A] DE 4232285 A1 19940331 - LOTTERMOSER MANFRED [DE]
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 08 30 June 1998 (1998-06-30)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 07 31 July 1996 (1996-07-31)
- [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198348, Derwent World Patents Index; Class A95, AN 1983-830039, XP002221661
- [XP] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2002, no. 10 10 October 2002 (2002-10-10)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1266971 A2 20021218; EP 1266971 A3 20030115; AU 4588002 A 20021212; CA 2390151 A1 20021211; JP 2002363626 A 20021218; US 2002194961 A1 20021226
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 02012441 A 20020610; AU 4588002 A 20020607; CA 2390151 A 20020611; JP 2001176249 A 20010611; US 16614402 A 20020611