Global Patent Index - EP 1266972 A1

EP 1266972 A1 2002-12-18 - Process for manufacturing a hardened sheet metal profile

Title (en)

Process for manufacturing a hardened sheet metal profile

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines gehärteten Blechprofils

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'un profilé de tôle durcie

Publication

EP 1266972 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02012153 A

Priority

DE 10128200 A

Abstract (en)

Production of a hardened sheet metal profile made from an optionally molded billet comprises: forming openings (5) with a protruding collar in flat regions of the billet and a bead (7) placed in the direction of the collars; heating the billet on a conveying device (4) in a heat treatment apparatus; deforming in a pressing tool to form a sheet metal profile; and hardening. Preferred Features: The bead is formed deeper than the collar. The bead is formed as a groove and orientated in the conveying device. The bead is flattened in the pressing tool.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Herstellung eines gehärteten Blechprofils aus einer Platine. Hierbei sind zunächst an der Platine 1 Durchzüge 5 mit vorstehenden Kragen 6 erzeugt worden sowie zwei nutartig gestaltete Sicken 7. Auf den Sicken 7 liegend wird die Platine 1 dann auf einem Fördermittel 4 in dem Ofen 2 erwärmt, anschließend in einem Pressenwerkzeug zum Blechprofil warm umgeformt und dann gehärtet. Im Bedarfsfall können die Sicken 7 vor dem Härten im Pressenwerkzeug eingeebnet werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 9/46; C21D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/00 (2006.01); C21D 9/46 (2006.01); C21D 1/673 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/46 (2013.01); B21D 19/088 (2013.01); B21D 22/022 (2013.01); C21D 9/0018 (2013.01); C21D 1/673 (2013.01); C21D 9/0068 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1266972 A1 20021218; EP 1266972 B1 20060628; DE 10128200 A1 20021219; DE 10128200 B4 20040722; DE 50207361 D1 20060810; US 2003000606 A1 20030102; US 6949151 B2 20050927

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140601

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-03-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50207361

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50207361

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130703

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130626

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130611

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070329

2007-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-01-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060628

2006-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060928

2006-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50207361 P 20060810

2006-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2006-06-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-06-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060628

2006-06-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BENTELER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021023

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI