Global Patent Index - EP 1266973 A2

EP 1266973 A2 2002-12-18 - Method for producing a lightweight moulded body and moulded body from foamed metal

Title (en)

Method for producing a lightweight moulded body and moulded body from foamed metal

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines leichtgewichtigen Formkörpers und Formkörper aus Metallschaum

Title (fr)

Procédé de réalisation d'un corps moulé léger et corps moulé en mousse métallique

Publication

EP 1266973 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02450137 A

Priority

AT 9352001 A

Abstract (en)

Production of a lightweight molded body comprises forming a metal foam from a molten metal by introducing gas or a gas mixture into it; partially inserting it into a mold and allowing to solidify. The metal foam has a monomodal distribution of the dimension of the hollow chambers. The molten metal boundary walls containing the hollow chambers have partially planar regions and the heat of solidification of the melt is removed. Preferred Features: The hollow chambers re completely separated from each other by a metal matrix made from aluminium or aluminium alloy. The particles of the metal matrix have a particle size of 1-50, preferably 3-20 mm.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Herstellung eines leichtgewichtigen Formkörpers, bei welchem aus einer Partikel aufweisenden Metallschmelze durch Einbringen von Gas oder Gasgemischen in diese ein Metallschaum gebildet, dieser zumindest teilweise in eine Kokille eingebracht und dessen flüssige Phase in dieser erstarren gelassen wird. Weiters ist Gegenstand der Erfindung ein leichtgewichtiger Formkörper aus Metallschaum bestehend aus einer Metallmatrix, in welche Partikel eingelagert sind und welche eine Vielzahl von im wesentlichen sphärischen und/oder im wesentlichen ellipsoiden Hohlräumen umschließt. Um ein vorgesehenes Werkstoffverhalten bei bestimmten Spannungszuständen zu erreichen, ist verfahrenstechnisch erfindungsgemäß vorgesehen, daß ein fließfähiger Metallschaum mit einer monomodalen Verteilung der Abmessung der Hohlräume und einem anteilsmäßig maximalen Durchmesser derselben im Bereich zwischen 1,0 und 30,0 mm hergestellt, in eine Gießform oder Kokille eingebracht und in dieser im wesentlichen unter allseitigem Druck verdichtet wird, wobei den die Hohlräume einschließenden Partikel beinhaltenden Metallschmelzen-Begrenzungswänden zumindest teilweise ebenflächige Bereiche erteilt werden und die Erstarrungswärme der Schmelze abgeführt wird. Der leichtgewichtige Formkörper aus Metallschaum ist nach der Erfindung im wesentlichen dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß der Metallschaum bei räumlicher Betrachtung eine monomodale Verteilung der maximalen Längserstreckungen der Hohlräume im Bereich zwischen 1,0 und 30,0 mm aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 1/08; C22C 32/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 19/14 (2006.01); B22D 1/00 (2006.01); B22D 25/00 (2006.01); B22D 25/02 (2006.01); B22D 27/09 (2006.01); C22C 1/08 (2006.01); C22C 1/10 (2006.01); C22C 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 1/08 (2013.01); B22D 25/005 (2013.01); B22F 2003/1106 (2013.01); B22F 2998/00 (2013.01); C22C 2001/083 (2013.01); C22C 2001/086 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B22F 2998/00 + B22F 3/1103 + C22C 32/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1266973 A2 20021218; EP 1266973 A3 20040818; EP 1266973 B1 20150304; AT 410103 B 20030225; AT A9352001 A 20020615; CA 2390766 A1 20021215; CA 2390766 C 20070612; CZ 20022035 A3 20030212; CZ 304437 B6 20140507; ES 2533772 T3 20150415; JP 2003119526 A 20030423; JP 4158170 B2 20081001; NO 20022756 A 20021216; NO 20022756 D0 20020610; PT 1266973 E 20150428; SI 1266973 T1 20150831

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-09-29 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170608

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170609

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170623

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170628

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170614

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-06-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150304

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-02-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20151207

2016-01-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150304

2016-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150304

2015-12-07 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50216022

2015-07-29 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20150401018

- Effective date: 20150618

2015-06-10 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2015-05-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2015-04-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20150406

2015-04-16 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50216022

- Effective date: 20150416

2015-04-15 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2533772 T3

- Effective date: 20150415

2015-04-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 713978 T

- Effective date: 20150415

2015-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER AND PEDRAZZINI AG, CH

2015-03-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2015-03-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2015-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2015-03-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: RO SI

2015-03-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2014-11-26 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20141028

2009-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091002

2005-05-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-05-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040925

- Countries: RO

2005-05-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040925

- Countries: SI

2004-11-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040925

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI