EP 1266974 A1 20021218 - Gold alloys and master alloys for obtaining them
Title (en)
Gold alloys and master alloys for obtaining them
Title (de)
Goldlegierungen und Vorlegierungen zu deren Herstellung
Title (fr)
Alliages d'or et alliages-mères pour leur obtention
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 01830349 A 20010530
Abstract (en)
Gold alloy comprising, by weight, at least Gold Au ≥ 51 %, Iridium Ir ≤ 0.1 %, Germanium Ge ≤ 2 % and Copper Cu ≤ 45 %. The alloy can also comprise, in percentage by weight, Silver Ag ≤ 34 %, nickel Ni ≤ 20 % and Zinc Zn ≤ 12 %. In some variations the gold alloy can further comprise no more than 4% of at least one of the elements of the group constituted by cobalt, manganese, tin and indium, and no more than 0.15% of at least one of the deoxidising elements of the group constituted by magnesium, silicon, boron and lithium. To the alloy can also be added at least one of the refining elements of the group constituted by ruthenium, rhenium and platinum in quantities not exceeding 0.4% by weight. The invention further relates to a master alloy for obtaining said gold alloy. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
CPC (source: EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [X] EP 0381994 A1 19900816 - HAFNER C GMBH & CO [DE]
- [X] DE 4320928 C1 19940317 - HERAEUS KULZER GMBH [DE]
- [X] DE 3019277 A1 19811126 - WIELAND FA DR TH [DE]
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 444 (C - 545) 22 November 1988 (1988-11-22)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 12 25 December 1997 (1997-12-25)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 04 30 April 1999 (1999-04-30)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 02 31 March 1995 (1995-03-31)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1266974 A1 20021218; EP 1266974 B1 20040929; AT E278045 T1 20041015; DE 60105987 D1 20041104; ES 2227106 T3 20050401; US 2003012679 A1 20030116
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 01830349 A 20010530; AT 01830349 T 20010530; DE 60105987 T 20010530; ES 01830349 T 20010530; US 15638602 A 20020529