Global Patent Index - EP 1266987 A2

EP 1266987 A2 2002-12-18 - Method for setting weaving looms and weaving looms installation

Title (en)

Method for setting weaving looms and weaving looms installation

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Einstellen von Webmaschinen und Webmaschinenanlage

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le réglage de métiers à tisser et ensemble de métier à tisser

Publication

EP 1266987 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02007996 A

Priority

DE 10127099 A

Abstract (en)

To set up a loom, specific data for the fabric to be woven are gathered for a patterning loom (1) and are stored, to control the loom operation. Mechanical data specific to the loom are gathered and stored, and similar data are established for other looms (X1,X2) to weave the same fabric, to be compared with the stored data. <??>To set up a loom, specific data for the fabric to be woven are gathered for a patterning loom (1) and are stored, to control the loom operation. Mechanical data specific to the loom are gathered and stored, and similar data are established for other looms (X1,X2) to weave the same fabric, to be compared with the stored data. The control (2) uses the mechanical and a fabric data to transmit control signals through a circuit (4) to the controls (3) of the other looms, to operate their weaving systems for the required weave.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Einstellen von Webmaschinen auf die Herstellung einer bestimmten Gewebetype (Artikel) werden zunächst auf einer Musterwebmaschine (1) die für diese Gewebetype warenspezifischen Einstelldaten der an dem Webvorgang beteiligten Baugruppen der Webmaschine (1) ermittelt. Außerdem werden die für die Bauart der Musterwebmaschine (1) und einer entsprechend einzustellenden Webmaschine (X1,X2) anderer Bauart kennzeichnenden, maschinenspezifischen Daten festgestellt und gespeichert. Sodann werden die auf der Musterwebmaschine (1) ermittelten warenspezifischen Einstelldaten auf der Grundlage eines Vergleiches der maschinenspezifischen Daten der Musterwebmaschine (1) und der einzustellenden Webmaschine (X1,X2) programmgemäß zu warenspezifischen Einstelldaten für die einzustellende Webmaschine (X1,X2) verarbeitet. Aus den so gewonnenen warenspezifischen Einstelldaten für die einzustellende Webmaschine (X1,X2) werden Steuerbefehle für Stellglieder der an dem Webvorgang beteiligten Baugruppen der einzustellenden Webmaschine (X1,X2) abgeleitet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 51/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 51/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 51/007 (2013.01); D03D 33/00 (2013.01); D03J 1/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1266987 A2 20021218; EP 1266987 A3 20030917; DE 10127099 A1 20021219; JP 2003020547 A 20030124; US 2002193904 A1 20021219

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-15 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041027

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031014

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI