Global Patent Index - EP 1266992 A2

EP 1266992 A2 2002-12-18 - Non-transparent fabric

Title (en)

Non-transparent fabric

Title (de)

Nichttransparentes Gewebe

Title (fr)

Tissu non transparent

Publication

EP 1266992 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02076685 A

Priority

NL 1018050 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to an at least partially non-transparent fabric, comprising a weave provided with a discontinuous pattern of dots which lie at a determined mutual distance and which are manufactured from a colour paste, preferably titanium dioxide paste which is optionally mixed with one or more dyes. The colour paste is preferably applied to the inside of the fabric. The invention further relates to clothing manufactured from the fabric, in particular hospital clothing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 11/00; A41D 13/12; D06P 1/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 11/0056 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1266992 A2 20021218; EP 1266992 A3 20040804; NL 1018050 C2 20021112

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080227

2007-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061201

2007-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061201

2005-04-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-03-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050119

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-08-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 06B 11/00 A

2004-08-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 41D 13/12 B

2004-08-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 06P 1/44 B

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI