Global Patent Index - EP 1266995 A2

EP 1266995 A2 2002-12-18 - Calender

Title (en)

Calender

Title (de)

Kalander

Title (fr)

Calandre

Publication

EP 1266995 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02011792 A

Priority

DE 10129102 A

Abstract (en)

The calender (1), with at least one stack (4,4') of calender rollers, has pedestals (10,10') each with a mounting edge (16,16') to carry the bearing mountings (8,9) of the rollers (5,5',6,6'), at an angle to the vertical of 30-60 degrees . The supporting edge (17,17') carries each pedestal on a supporting surface (20) below the mounting edges. A connecting edge (18,18') links the mounting and support edges. A plate gives a common mounting for the mounting edge, supporting edge and the connecting edge.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Kalander (1) angegeben mit mindestens einem Walzenstapel (4, 4') aus maximal drei Walzen (5, 6), die mindestens einen Nip (7, 7') bilden, der durch zwei Walzen (5, 5', 6, 6') begrenzt ist, und mit einer Ständeranordnung, die an jedem axialen Ende des Walzenstapels (4, 4') einen Ständer (10, 10') aufweist, in dem die Walzen mit Hilfe von Walzenlagern (8, 9) gelagert sind. Man möchte bei einem derartigen Kalander einerseits eine hohe Betriebsgeschwindigkeit erzielen können, andererseits den Walzenwechsel auf einfache Weise vornehmen können. Hierzu weist der Ständer (10, 10') eine Lagerkante (16, 16'), an der die Walzenlager (8, 9) angeordnet sind und die gegenüber der Vertikalen um einen Winkel im Bereich von 30° bis 60° geneigt ist, eine Aufstandskante (17, 17'), mit der der Ständer (10, 10') auf einer Aufstellfläche (20) steht und die sich unterhalb der Lagerkante (16, 16') erstreckt, und eine Verbindungskante (18, 18') auf, die eine Verbindung zwischen der Lagerkante (16, 16') und der Aufstandskante (17, 17') bildet, wobei die Lagerkante (16, 16'), die Aufstandskante (17, 17') und die Verbindungskante (18, 18') durch eine Platte miteinander in Verbindung stehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1266995 A2 20021218; EP 1266995 A3 20030723; EP 1266995 B1 20050302; DE 10129102 A1 20030102; DE 10129102 B4 20051215; US 2003024413 A1 20030206; US 6705216 B2 20040316

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-01-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-05-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060529

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-05-12 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050512

- Year of fee payment: 4

2005-05-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50202351 P 20050407

2005-04-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2004-04-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040202

2003-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030621

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI