Global Patent Index - EP 1267019 A2

EP 1267019 A2 2002-12-18 - Vehicle door handle

Title (en)

Vehicle door handle

Title (de)

Türgriff für Automobile

Title (fr)

Poignée de porte pour véhicule

Publication

EP 1267019 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010998 A

Priority

DE 10129112 A

Abstract (en)

An elongated plastic mounting (10) is contained inside the door. The ends of an elongated handle-section (12) have sideways protruding mounting sections (14) each fitting through an opening in the door's outer skin into recesses in the mounting. One of the mounting sections is swivel mounted, while the second mounting section can move to and fro in the cavity. A swivel mounted operating lever in the first mounting is pre-tensioned by a spring and has a lever attachment. The spring section belonging to the second mounting cavity has a ramp surface

Abstract (de)

Türgriff für Automobile mit einem länglichen Lagerbauteil aus Kunststoff, das im Inneren einer Tür anbringbar ist, einem länglichen Griffabschnitt, der an den Enden zwei zu einer Seite hin abstehende Lagerabschnitte aufweist, die durch jeweils eine Öffnung in der Außenhaut der Tür hindurch in Lagerausnehmungen des Lagerbauteils aufnehmbar sind, wobei der eine Lagerabschnitt in der zugeordneten Lagerausnehmung im wesentlichen schwenkbar gelagert ist und der zweite Lagerabschnitt in der Ausnehmung eine Hin- und Herbewegung ausführen kann, einem im Lagerbauteil schwenkbar gelagerten Betätigungshebel, an dem ein Betätigungsgestänge für ein Schloß der Automobiltür anbringbar ist und der von einer Feder in eine Schwenkrichtung vorgespannt ist und einen Hebelansatz aufweist, der mit einem Anlageabschnitt des zweiten Lagerabschnitts so zusammenwirkt, daß der Griffabschnitt von der Feder über den Hebelansatz in eine Ausgangsstellung vorgespannt ist, einem der zweiten Lagerausnehmung zugeordneten Federabschnitt, der bei der Bewegung des Hebelansatzes in Richtung maximaler Vorspannung des Betätigungshebels ausgelenkt wird, bis ein freier Endabschnitt des Hebelansatzes hinter eine Anschlagfläche des Federabschnitts greift und in seiner Stellung verriegelt wird und einer Rampenfläche am Federabschnitt, die in Eingriff mit einer Auslenkfläche des zweiten Lagerabschnitts bringbar ist, wenn der Griffabschnitt nach außen von dem Lagerbauteil fortbewegt wird, wodurch die Anschlagfläche den Hebelansatz freigibt und dieser in Anlage mit dem zweiten Lagerabschnitt kommt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 7/00; E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 79/06 (2014.01); E05B 85/16 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 79/06 (2013.01); E05B 85/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1267019 A2 20021218; EP 1267019 A3 20040421; EP 1267019 B1 20050330; DE 10129112 A1 20030102; DE 10129112 B4 20050217; ES 2238517 T3 20050901

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180529

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130517

2013-06-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ITW AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ITW AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS GMBH & CO. KG, 58636 ISERLOHN, DE

- Document: DE 50202603

- Effective date: 20130502

2013-06-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50202603

- Representative's name: HAUCK PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130502

2013-06-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50202603

- Representative's name: HAUCK PATENTANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20130502

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120524

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120607

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100518

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100517

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110704

2011-07-14 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110714

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100517

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090528

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060102

2005-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2238517 T3

2005-07-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050614

2005-05-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50202603 P 20050504

2005-03-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-03-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-01-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-04-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020615

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI