Global Patent Index - EP 1267054 B1

EP 1267054 B1 2004-12-29 - Four-stroke internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Four-stroke internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Viertaktbrennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Moteur à combustion interne à quatre temps

Publication

EP 1267054 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 02020881 A

Priority

  • EP 00904332 A
  • US 11721599 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1486652A1] A four-stroke internal combustion engine (20) is provided. There is provided within an engine housing (28) an oil reservoir (126) and a valve chamber (156) which independently communicate with a crank chamber (124). A strategically placed divider (116) and passageway, located within the engine housing (28), appropriately direct lubricant within the engine housing (28) so that the internal cavity of the engine is lubricated during use in various operating attitudes, and so that the fluid flows to and is held in the proper chambers of the engine housing during storage. There is also provided a breather arrangement for an internal combustion engine (20) which includes a cam shaft (98) having a hollow passageway in communication wit the crank chamber (124) and the air intake system of the engine. There is also provided an engine housing which can be utilized for engines having different horse power ratings. There is also provided a crankshaft bearing assembly (68, 70) which prevents damage to the bearing upon insertion of the crankshaft (80) into the crank chamber (124). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 63/02; F02B 75/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/04 (2006.01); F01M 3/00 (2006.01); F01M 9/10 (2006.01); F01M 11/00 (2006.01); F01M 11/06 (2006.01); F01M 13/02 (2006.01); F02B 63/02 (2006.01); F02B 69/00 (2006.01); F02B 75/16 (2006.01); F02F 1/30 (2006.01); F01M 1/06 (2006.01); F01M 13/04 (2006.01); F02B 1/04 (2006.01); F02B 75/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 3/00 (2013.01); F01M 1/04 (2013.01); F01M 9/10 (2013.01); F01M 11/0004 (2013.01); F01M 11/064 (2013.01); F01M 11/065 (2013.01); F01M 11/067 (2013.01); F01M 13/022 (2013.01); F02B 63/02 (2013.01); F02B 69/00 (2013.01); F02B 75/16 (2013.01); F02F 1/305 (2013.01); F01M 11/06 (2013.01); F01M 2001/064 (2013.01); F01M 2011/0041 (2013.01); F01M 2013/0422 (2013.01); F02B 1/04 (2013.01); F02B 2075/027 (2013.01); F02B 2275/22 (2013.01); F02B 2275/30 (2013.01); F05C 2201/021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1486652 A1 20041215; EP 1486652 B1 20061018; DK 1147298 T3 20050627; DK 1267056 T3 20050627; EP 1267052 A1 20021218; EP 1267052 B1 20041229; EP 1267053 A1 20021218; EP 1267054 A1 20021218; EP 1267054 B1 20041229; EP 1267055 A1 20021218; EP 1267056 A1 20021218; EP 1267056 B1 20050323

INPADOC legal status


2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120113

2012-11-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60017200

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120113

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120928

2012-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120113

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110112

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110105

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110118

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080114

2008-09-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-09-01 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2007-01-15 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070115

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-01-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070104

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-05-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-04-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60017200 P 20050203

2004-12-29 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1147298 P

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT SE

2004-12-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HIRSCH, NICOLAS ROBERT

2004-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHAEFER, MARK DONALD

2004-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRAUN, MICHAEL PAUL

2004-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOTZ, PETER

2004-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WIATROWSKI, DARRELL ALBERT

2004-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BARTELT, RONALD LEE

2004-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HUBBARD, BRIAN

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT SE

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030416

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-12-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1147298

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT SE