Global Patent Index - EP 1267133 A1

EP 1267133 A1 2002-12-18 - Shutter device for ventilation ducts, particularly as fire-arrester

Title (en)

Shutter device for ventilation ducts, particularly as fire-arrester

Title (de)

Verschlussvorrichtung für Lüftungskanäle, insbesondere Feuersperre

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'obturation pour conduits de ventilation, en particulier dispositif coupe-feu

Publication

EP 1267133 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01830382 A

Priority

EP 01830382 A

Abstract (en)

A fire-shutter (12) is rotatable within a duct (10) between an open and a closed position. A shutter-tripping unit supported on a base plate (22), mounted externally on the duct, has a heat sensor (56) projecting within the duct and a spring-loaded mechanism triggered by the heat sensor to move the shutter to a tripped position in case of abnormal heat. The spring-loaded mechanism comprises a spring-driven rotatable shaft (24) extending through said base plate (22) and duct wall (10), a crank (28) keyed to the shaft and a linking rod (30) having one end linked to the crank and its opposite end linked to a bracket (32) carried excentrically on one side of the shutter (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/14; A62C 2/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 2/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 2/241 (2013.01); F24F 11/35 (2018.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1267133 A1 20021218

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070314

2007-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061103

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TECHNICA S.N.C. DI GUAZZONE F. & C.

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030530

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI