Global Patent Index - EP 1267141 A2

EP 1267141 A2 2002-12-18 - Method and device for deciding the activation of a braking system in order to correct the ballistic flight of a projectile towards its target

Title (en)

Method and device for deciding the activation of a braking system in order to correct the ballistic flight of a projectile towards its target

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtungen zum Bestimmen des Auslösens einer Bremseinrichtung für die zielbezogene Korrektur der ballistischen Flugbahn eines Projektils

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour l'activation d'un dispositif de freinage pour corriger le trajectoire ballistique d'un projectile vers une cible

Publication

EP 1267141 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02013120 A

Priority

DE 10129043 A

Abstract (en)

The mechanism for determining the point at which a braking system should be applied to a projectile to correct its trajectory comprises an rpm sensor on it. This is sensitive to gravity or the Earth's magnetic field. An Independent claim is included for a method for determining the point at which a braking system should be applied to a projectile to correct its trajectory

Abstract (de)

Die apparativ und energetisch sehr aufwendige Satelliten-Navigationseinrichtung an Bord eines drallstabilisiert verschossenen Projektils, zur Bestimmung eines Bremsauslösepunktes für zielbezogene Korrektur seiner zunächst noch über das Ziel hinaus weisenden ballistischen Flugbahn, wird erfindungsgemäß gestützt auf oder sogar ersetzt durch an Bord des Projektils bewegungsabhängig, wie insbesondere aus dem Projektil-Drall, gewinnbare Informationen. Vorzugsweise wird der Bremsauslösepunkt dadurch vorgegeben, daß das Projektil eine unter Berücksichtigung des Dralls bei Verlassen des Abschußrohres vorgegebene Anzahl an Umdrehungen akkumuliert hat, was an Bord des Projektils einfach mittels des Ansprechens eines Schwerkraftpendels oder eines Erdmagnetfeld-Sensors detektierbar ist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 10/48; F41G 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41G 7/30 (2006.01); F42B 10/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 10/48 (2013.01); F41G 7/305 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1267141 A2 20021218; EP 1267141 A3 20031029; DE 10129043 A1 20030102

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-23 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050202

2005-03-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEHL BGT DEFENCE GMBH & CO.KG

2004-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-07-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI