Global Patent Index - EP 1267169 A2

EP 1267169 A2 2002-12-18 - Biochemical analysis unit and method for its production

Title (en)

Biochemical analysis unit and method for its production

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Durchführung biochemischer Analysen und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour analyses biochimiques et procédé de production

Publication

EP 1267169 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02010873 A

Priority

  • JP 2001150414 A
  • JP 2001298368 A
  • JP 2001192895 A
  • JP 2001192896 A
  • JP 2001186287 A

Abstract (en)

The biochemical analysis unit (1, 121, 141, 201, 301) has a base plate (5, 125, 205, 305) and absorptive regions (4, 124, 144, 204, 304). The absorptive regions (4, 124, 144, 204, 304) are surrounded by the base plate formed of materials which shield a radioactive ray and a light. In the absorptive regions (4, 124, 144, 204, 304) are applied and absorbed specific binding substances to be bound with substances derived from a living organism that are labeled with labeling substances for generating the radioactive ray or the light. The base plate (5, 125) prevents the specific binding substances from penetrating in the other absorptive regions (4, 124, 144, 204, 304). When an analysis of data of the radioactive ray and the light is carried out, an image of the radioactive ray and the light is generated without noises.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/543; B01J 19/00; C12M 1/40; G01N 33/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01L 99/00 (2010.01); B01L 3/00 (2006.01); G01N 21/64 (2006.01); G01N 21/76 (2006.01); G01N 23/04 (2006.01); G01N 33/487 (2006.01); B01L 3/02 (2006.01); C40B 60/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 23/04 (2013.01); B01L 3/5085 (2013.01); G01N 21/6428 (2013.01); G01N 21/6452 (2013.01); G01N 21/76 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00317 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00364 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00527 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00585 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00596 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00605 (2013.01); B01J 2219/0061 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00612 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00621 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00626 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00637 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00644 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00659 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00689 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00702 (2013.01); B01L 3/02 (2013.01); B01L 2300/069 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0829 (2013.01); B01L 2300/168 (2013.01); C40B 60/14 (2013.01); G01N 21/0303 (2013.01); G01N 2201/0642 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1267169 A2 20021218; EP 1267169 A3 20030528; EP 1267169 B1 20041215; DE 60202240 D1 20050120; DE 60202240 T2 20051215; DE 60236951 D1 20100819; EP 1445613 A2 20040811; EP 1445613 A3 20060607; EP 1445613 B1 20100707; US 2002197568 A1 20021226; US 2007184483 A1 20070809; US 7220389 B2 20070522

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150515

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-02-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150516

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150515

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60202240

2014-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140513

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140507

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140509

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140514

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-09-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2007-09-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-12-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050916

2005-03-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60202240 P 20050120

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2004-12-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-02-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI