Global Patent Index - EP 1267330 A1

EP 1267330 A1 2002-12-18 - Reducing sparseness in coded speech signals

Title (en)

Reducing sparseness in coded speech signals

Title (de)

Erhöhung der Dichte von kodierten Sprachsignalen

Title (fr)

Réduction de la dispersion dans les signaux vocaux codés

Publication

EP 1267330 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02013526 A

Priority

  • EP 98940752 A
  • US 5775297 P
  • US 3459098 A
  • US 11098998 A

Abstract (en)

Sparseness is reduced in an input digital signal which includes a first sequence of sample values. An output digital signal is produced in response to the input digital signal. The output digital signal includes a second sequence of sample values, which second sequence of sample values has a greater density of non-zero sample values than the first sequence of sample values. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 19/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/18 (2013.01); G10L 19/002 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/18 (2013.01); G10L 19/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0709827 A2 19960501 - MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]
  • [A] WO 9618185 A1 19960613 - MOTOROLA INC [US]
  • [A] WO 9113432 A1 19910905 - UNIV SHERBROOKE [CA]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 557 (P - 1626) 7 October 1993 (1993-10-07) & US 5806037 A 19980908 - SOGO AKIRA [JP]
  • [PA] HAGEN ET AL: "Removal of sparse-excitation artifacts in CELP", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, XX, XX, vol. 1, 12 May 1998 (1998-05-12), pages 145 - 148, XP002083369

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1267330 A1 20021218; EP 1267330 B1 20050119

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170825

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170823

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2006-01-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051020

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-16 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1051082

2005-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69828709 P 20050224

2005-01-19 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1008141 P

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-01-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (PUBL)

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030327

2002-12-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1008141

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT