Global Patent Index - EP 1267442 A1

EP 1267442 A1 2002-12-18 - Method for reconstruction of gain/phase-maps of phased array antenna transmit/receive-modules

Title (en)

Method for reconstruction of gain/phase-maps of phased array antenna transmit/receive-modules

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Rekonstruktion der Amplituden/Phasendiagramme der Sende-Empfangs-Module einer phasengesteuerten Gruppenantenne

Title (fr)

Méthode pour reconstruire les diagrammes de gain et de phase des modules émetteur-récepteur pour une antenne réseau

Publication

EP 1267442 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02010035 A

Priority

DE 10127080 A

Abstract (en)

Amplitude and phase for amplitude/phase conditions (APC) for a single a amplitude condition and for a single b phase condition are measured. Amplitude values for an x amplitude condition are reconstructed by supplanting the measured amplitude values of an a amplitude condition with a difference ( DELTA A) in the measured amplitude values of both (x,b),(a,b) APC, also belonging to the x amplitude condition and the a amplitude condition within the phase condition.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Rekonstruktion des Amplituden/Phasendiagramms eines Sende-Empfangs-Moduls für eine phasengesteuerte Gruppenantenne. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 3/26; G01R 29/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/267 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

No Search

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1267442 A1 20021218; EP 1267442 B1 20041117; AT 282899 T 20041215; DE 10127080 C1 20030116; ES 2232695 T3 20050601; US 2002190899 A1 20021219; US 6744405 B2 20040601

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170507

2018-06-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180629

2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170506

2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171201

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170506

2018-03-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170601

2018-03-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180131

2018-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170507

2018-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170506

2018-01-03 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170601

2018-01-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50201547

2017-08-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HENSOLDT SENSORS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AIRBUS DS ELECTRONICS AND BORDER SECURITY GMBH, 82024 TAUFKIRCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50201547

2017-08-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50201547

- Representative's name: LIFETECH IP SPIES & BEHRNDT PATENTANWAELTE PAR, DE

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-05-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AIRBUS DS ELECTRONICS AND BORDER SECURITY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AIRBUS DEFENCE AND SPACE GMBH, 85521 OTTOBRUNN, DE

- Document: DE 50201547

2016-05-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HENSOLDT SENSORS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AIRBUS DEFENCE AND SPACE GMBH, 85521 OTTOBRUNN, DE

- Document: DE 50201547

2015-05-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-10-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AIRBUS DEFENCE AND SPACE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: EADS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, 85521 OTTOBRUNN, DE

- Document: DE 50201547

- Effective date: 20140916

2014-10-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AIRBUS DS ELECTRONICS AND BORDER SECURITY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: EADS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, 85521 OTTOBRUNN, DE

- Document: DE 50201547

- Effective date: 20140916

2014-10-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HENSOLDT SENSORS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: EADS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, 85521 OTTOBRUNN, DE

- Document: DE 50201547

- Effective date: 20140916

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050417

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *EADS DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050531

2007-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: EADS DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-06-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2232695 T3

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-05-06 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-05-06 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-04-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050316

2005-03-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-02-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050217

2005-02-17 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050217

2004-12-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50201547 P 20041223

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-11-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-17 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041117

2004-11-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041117

2004-11-17 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041117

2004-05-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01Q 3/26 A

2004-05-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01R 29/10 B

2004-05-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR RECONSTRUCTION OF GAIN/PHASE-MAPS OF PHASED ARRAY ANTENNA TRANSMIT/RECEIVE-MODULES

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030808

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI