Global Patent Index - EP 1268962 A4

EP 1268962 A4 2003-06-18 - SECURITY LOCKS

Title (en)

SECURITY LOCKS

Title (de)

SICHERHEITSSCHLOSS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIFS DE VERROUILLAGE DE SECURITE

Publication

EP 1268962 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00916520 A

Priority

US 0007245 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2402008C] A locking device for sporting items such as skateboards (10), snowboards (96 ), snow skis (102a, 102b), and the like. The locking device includes a member (20) which can be affixed to a wheel truck (14) of a skateboard (10), binding of a snowboard, or binding (104a, 104b) of a snow ski (102a, 102b), and includes a releasabl e cable (22) which can be wrapped around a fixed or stationary object. In one embodiment, the cable (22) can be extended and retracted from the body of the locking device so as to provide a suitable length of the cable (22). The cable (22) is normally retained in a flanged section (68) of the locking device, but can be released therefrom for attachment to the fixed or stationary object. Another embodiment includes a removable cable (74) and lock (72), and a further embodiment provides a relatively simple locking bracket (62) between the wheel truck (14) and board of a skateboard (10) and which can be used with a separate cable (22) and lock (24).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 73/00; A63C 11/00; A63C 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 73/00 (2006.01); A63C 11/00 (2006.01); A63C 17/00 (2006.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

AU 3761000 A 20011003; CA 2402008 A1 20010927; CA 2402008 C 20070109; EP 1268962 A1 20030102; EP 1268962 A4 20030618; JP 2003528235 A 20030924

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050330

2004-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040915

2003-06-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 73/00 A

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 63C 11/00 B

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 63C 17/00 B

2003-06-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FONTES, ROSS, M.

2003-06-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MARCH, ANDREW, J.

2003-06-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MILLAR, DAVID, R.

2003-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021016

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI