Global Patent Index - EP 1269876 A3

EP 1269876 A3 2003-06-18 - Fastener product made of hydrolysis-resistent synthetic resin

Title (en)

Fastener product made of hydrolysis-resistent synthetic resin

Title (de)

Hydrolysebeständiges Harz für Verschlussvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Produit d'attachage en résine synthétique résistante à l'hydrolyse

Publication

EP 1269876 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02254526 A

Priority

JP 2001194563 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1269876A2] In a fastener product made of a synthetic resin such as a slide fastener, a separable fastener and a snap tape comprising an attachment part and an engagement part, at least the engagement part is made of a hydrolysis-resistant synthetic resin. Preferably, the hydrolysis-resistant synthetic resin is polyester having a carbodiimide-based hydrolytic stabilizing agent incorporated therein. In a slide fastener (1-1c) having a pair of fastener tapes (3-3i) and coupling elements (4-4i) fixed to the longitudinal edges of the fastener tapes, they are made of a hydrolysis-resistant synthetic resin material. When the slide fastener further comprises upper and lower stop members (7, 8), a pin-and-box separator (10), a pair of reinforcing sheet-like members (9), sewing threads (21) and core cords (20), they are made of the hydrolysis-resistant synthetic resin material. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44B 19/00; A44B 17/00; A44B 18/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 19/32 (2006.01); A44B 17/00 (2006.01); A44B 18/00 (2006.01); A44B 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 19/00 (2013.01); A44B 17/0029 (2013.01); A44B 18/0069 (2013.01); Y10T 24/2561 (2013.01); Y10T 24/2792 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1269876 A2 20030102; EP 1269876 A3 20030618; EP 1269876 B1 20091209; CN 1208006 C 20050629; CN 1393190 A 20030129; DE 60234663 D1 20100121; ES 2334645 T3 20100315; HK 1051126 A1 20050923; JP 2003009913 A 20030114; KR 100851446 B1 20080808; KR 20030004084 A 20030114; US 2003000051 A1 20030102

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170706

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170619

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170511

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100910

2010-03-15 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2334645 T3

2010-01-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60234663 P 20100121

2009-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-12-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040824

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 44B 19/00 A

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 44B 18/00 B

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 44B 17/00 B

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020705

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI