Global Patent Index - EP 1270400 A3

EP 1270400 A3 2003-06-04 - Mast device with buoyant unit for a submarine

Title (en)

Mast device with buoyant unit for a submarine

Title (de)

Mastvorrichtung mit schwimmfähiger Einheit für ein Unterseeboot

Title (fr)

Dispositif de mât avec une unité flottante pour un sous-marin

Publication

EP 1270400 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02009925 A

Priority

DE 10129696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1270400A2] A device for transmitting and receiving information is provided at the end of the mast and is electrically connected to the submarine. The device is arranged in a floatable unit (4) that is held without connection to the top end of the mast. The floatable unit is fixed to a bendable, coupling device (7), such as a wire or carbon-fiber rope that can be let out or pulled in, and which is as long as the maximum observation diving depth of the submarine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63G 8/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63G 8/38 (2006.01); H01Q 1/12 (2006.01); H01Q 1/34 (2006.01); B63B 22/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/34 (2013.01); B63G 8/38 (2013.01); H01Q 1/12 (2013.01); B63B 22/18 (2013.01); B63B 2203/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1270400 A2 20030102; EP 1270400 A3 20030604; EP 1270400 B1 20041103; DE 10129696 A1 20030102; US 2003000448 A1 20030102; US 2005279272 A1 20051222; US 6907839 B2 20050621; US 7000561 B2 20060221

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170315

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-03-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160504

2017-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160503

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150415

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-03-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-06-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-01-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50201435 P 20041209

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-11-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031128

2003-11-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI