Global Patent Index - EP 1270830 A3

EP 1270830 A3 2003-06-04 - Lavatory flush tank feed valve

Title (en)

Lavatory flush tank feed valve

Title (de)

Zufuhrventil für einen Spülkasten

Title (fr)

Clapet d'alimentation pour une chasse d'eau

Publication

EP 1270830 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02014337 A

Priority

IT MI20011396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1270830A2] A lavatory flush tank feed valve (1) of the type having a valve assembly (4) housed in a body (2) and controlled by a main float (11) movable with respect to the body; an auxiliary float (31), carried by the main float (11), moves a corresponding retaining member (32), which engages and disengages a seat integral with the body to connect and disconnect the main float (11) and the body (2) alongside a variation in the level of the water in the flush tank. The feed valve thus withstands relatively high operating pressures (even over 20 bars) of the water mains to which it is connected, despite employing standard valve assemblies, and adapts automatically to different operating pressures with no major adjustment required in the level of the main float. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1270830 A2 20030102; EP 1270830 A3 20030604; AU 5069602 A 20030102; AU 784966 B2 20060810; IT MI20011396 A1 20021230; IT MI20011396 D0 20010629

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100105

2007-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060908

2006-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060908

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031125

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI