Global Patent Index - EP 1271739 A8

EP 1271739 A8 2003-06-25 - Calbration of the current to pinching force of an electric window with spring-tensioned cables

Title (en)

Calbration of the current to pinching force of an electric window with spring-tensioned cables

Title (de)

Kalibrierung des Verhältnisses zwischen Strom und Einklemmkraft eines elektrischen Fensterhebers mit federgespannten Kabeln

Title (fr)

Calibrage du rapport entre l'intensité d'un courant et la force de pincement dans un lève-vitre électrique à câbles tendus par un ressort

Publication

EP 1271739 A8 (FR)

Application

EP 02291471 A

Priority

FR 0108015 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1271739A1] The characteristic magnitude of the electric motor is the value of its supply current. The current variation ( DELTA I2) is measured between a minimum value (Im) and the value (Io) at the start of a stabilized phase. The force (F), applied by springs (8a,8b) due to stretching ( DELTA z) caused by current between (Im) and (Io), is measured by application of F = k x DELTA z., where DELTA z is determined from the angle of rotation of the motor. <??>Method of calculating the relation K between motor (2) supply current variation driving a kinematic chain designed to displace a part (7) with respect to a support and the variation of the force applied by the motor on the moving part. The kinematic chain includes spring (8,8b) tensioned cables (5) having a known stiffness (k).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02H 7/085

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/48 (2006.01); H02H 7/085 (2006.01); E05F 15/00 (2006.01); H02H 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/485 (2013.01); E05F 15/41 (2013.01); H02H 7/0851 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01); H02H 3/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1271739 A1 20030102; EP 1271739 A8 20030625; FR 2826115 A1 20021220; FR 2826115 B1 20040123

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070103

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030407

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI