Global Patent Index - EP 1273874 A3

EP 1273874 A3 2003-06-25 - Method for defining the kinematic characteristics of a flying object

Title (en)

Method for defining the kinematic characteristics of a flying object

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Bestimmung der kinematischen Kenngrössen eines Flugobjektes

Title (fr)

Méthode pour définir les caractéristiques cinématiques d'un objet volant

Publication

EP 1273874 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02014706 A

Priority

DE 10132317 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1273874A2] Inertia acceleration and the active components of the earths magnetic field in the radial direction relative to the roll axis of the flying object are measured from the ground over a given trajectory path for the object. The measurements are recorded with a time stamp and processed to provide data which gives the ground-related position, speed and acceleration, as well as the flying object-related Euler angle, kinematic starting angle, acceleration and rotation rate. The known direction of the earths magnetic field in the flight region is projected onto the roll plane for the object in order to carry out the data processing. Independent claims are also included for (a) a first device used to carry out this method, comprising at least three on-board acceleration sensors, preferably orthogonal to each other and only one magnetic field sensor with the measuring axis extending in a radial direction relative to the object roll axis, and (b) a second device similar to the first one, except that there are two magnetic field sensors, preferably orthogonal to each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 35/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0382131 A1 19900816 - JUNGHANS GMBH GEB [DE]
  • [A] ANDERSON J A ET AL: "STRUCTURED VALIDATION OF MISSILE SYSTEMS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE 1996 NATIONAL AEROSPACE AND ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE (NAECON). DAYTON, MAY 20 - 23, 1996, PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE NATIONAL AEROSPACE AND ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE (NAECON), NEW YORK, IEEE, US, vol. 2, 20 May 1996 (1996-05-20), pages 553 - 556, XP001072346, ISBN: 0-7803-3307-1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1273874 A2 20030108; EP 1273874 A3 20030625; DE 10132317 A1 20030116

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040924

2004-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: OERLIKON CONTRAVES GMBH

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-01-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI