Global Patent Index - EP 1275493 A3

EP 1275493 A3 2003-06-18 - Flat bag package

Title (en)

Flat bag package

Title (de)

Verpackung in Form eines Flachbeutels

Title (fr)

Emballage composé de sac plat

Publication

EP 1275493 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02012128 A

Priority

DE 20111446 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1275493A2] Packaging in the form of a flat bag (8) made from folded flat film has a security label (5) applied on the inner side of the flat film before folding. Preferred Features: The security label is applied to a reinforcing inlay strip (3). The flat film can be printed on at least in the region of the security label.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 19/90; B65D 75/54; G09F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 19/90 (2006.01); B65D 75/54 (2006.01); G09F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/0292 (2013.01); B65D 75/54 (2013.01); B31B 70/81 (2017.08)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20111446 U1 20011004; EP 1275493 A2 20030115; EP 1275493 A3 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050510

2005-02-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050107

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031126

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI