Global Patent Index - EP 1275902 B1

EP 1275902 B1 2007-10-17 - Air and exhaust gas duct suitable for the active cleaning of the outer surface of a roof

Title (en)

Air and exhaust gas duct suitable for the active cleaning of the outer surface of a roof

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Luft- und Abgasführung zur aktiven Reinhaltung der Dachoberfläche

Title (fr)

Conduite d'air et de fumées adaptée au nettoyage actif d'une toiture

Publication

EP 1275902 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 02015798 A

Priority

DE 10134236 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1275902A2] Device for guiding air and exhaust gas, especially for a gas-heated heat-generating device, comprises at least one exhaust gas pipe (2) and at least one, preferably concentric, air inlet pipe (3). At least the surfaces of the device exposed to exhaust gas and/or weathering are at least partially coated or made of a material, especially a ceramic or copper-containing material, which is inert to the combustion air and/or exhaust gas. An Independent claim is also included for the use of a gas-guiding device, especially an exhaust gas pipe, coated with a ceramic or copper-containing material as an insert in or attachment on an air- and exhaust gas-guiding device. Preferred Features: Wind and weather protection (5) is provided in the form of at least one gas-guiding device guaranteeing spatial separation of the inlet air and exhaust gas flows. At least part of the device is made of sheet copper. A surface of copper-containing and/or ceramic material is profiled to increase the surface area. The ceramic material is titanium, especially titanium dioxide.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23J 13/02 (2006.01); F23L 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23J 13/025 (2013.01); F23L 17/04 (2013.01); F23J 2211/101 (2013.01); F23J 2213/303 (2013.01); F23J 2213/304 (2013.01); F23J 2213/50 (2013.01); F23J 2900/13001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1275902 A2 20030115; EP 1275902 A3 20030507; EP 1275902 B1 20071017; AT 376149 T 20071115; DE 10134236 A1 20030206; DE 50211074 D1 20071129; ES 2295262 T3 20080416

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090715

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090716

2010-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090716

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090715

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080926

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080716

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080711

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080729

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080718

2008-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2295262 T3

2007-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50211074 P 20071129

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061107

2004-01-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2003-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-05-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI