Global Patent Index - EP 1277662 B2

EP 1277662 B2 2007-10-17 - Method of producing a sealed package of a pourable food product, and package so formed

Title (en)

Method of producing a sealed package of a pourable food product, and package so formed

Title (de)

Herstellungsverfahren einer versiegelten Verpackung für fliessfähige Lebensmittel sowie somit hergestellte Verpackung

Title (fr)

Méthode de production d'un emballage scellé pour aliments fluides et emballage ainsi formé

Publication

EP 1277662 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 01116561 A

Priority

EP 01116561 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1277662A1] There is described a method of producing a sealed package (1) of a pourable food product from a multilayer sheet packaging material (2) including layers of thermoplastic material (6, 8), of barrier material (7), and of base material (5); the method including the steps of forming in the sheet packaging material (2) a removable portion (10, 10') including at least layers of thermoplastic material (6, 8) and of barrier material (7); applying about the removable portion (10, 10') a frame (11) defining a pour opening (12); fitting to the frame (11) a removable cap (13) closing the pour opening (12), by causing the cap (13) to adhere directly to the removable portion (10, 10'); and providing the removable portion (10, 10') with a layer of stiffening material (15, 36). <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/74 (2006.01); B65D 5/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/749 (2013.01); B65D 5/708 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1277662 A1 20030122; EP 1277662 B1 20050511; EP 1277662 B2 20071017; AT 295307 T 20050515; DE 60110778 D1 20050616; DE 60110778 T2 20060223; DE 60110778 T3 20080124; ES 2240283 T3 20051016; ES 2240283 T5 20080416; PT 1277662 E 20050930

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170613

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160706

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160705

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160711

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-08-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160111

2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150709

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 295307 T

- Effective date: 20150709

2016-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-01-19 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20160111

2015-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20140704

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-12-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20140110

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140626

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140714

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2008-06-27 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE SA

- Free text: TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE SA#AVENUE GENERAL-GUISAN 70, P.O. BOX 430#1009 PULLY (CH) -TRANSFER TO- TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE SA#AVENUE GENERAL-GUISAN 70, P.O. BOX 430#1009 PULLY (CH)

2008-04-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2008-02-05 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2008-02-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2007-12-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20071017

2007-12-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE SA

- Effective date: 20071003

2007-11-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2007-10-17 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20071017

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-10-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE SA

2006-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SIG TECHNOLOGY LTD.

2006-04-19 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-03-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIG TECHNOLOGY LTD.

- Effective date: 20060127

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2240283 T3

2005-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20050713

2005-08-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-08-11 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-08-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-11 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050711

2005-07-09 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050709

2005-07-09 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050709

2005-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2005-06-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60110778 P 20050616

2005-06-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-05-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-05-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-05-11 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050511

2005-05-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050511

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030714

2003-10-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI