Global Patent Index - EP 1278762 A4

EP 1278762 A4 2003-06-18 - NUCLEIC ACID CONSTRUCT SYSTEM AND METHOD UTILIZING SAME USEFUL FOR IDENTIFYING PROTEIN-PROTEIN INTERACTIONS

Title (en)

NUCLEIC ACID CONSTRUCT SYSTEM AND METHOD UTILIZING SAME USEFUL FOR IDENTIFYING PROTEIN-PROTEIN INTERACTIONS

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUM HERSTELLEN VON NUKLEINSÄUREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANWENDUNG, UM PROTEIN-PROTEIN-INTERAKTIONEN ZU IDENTIFIZIEREN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE PRODUIT DE RECOMBINAISON D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE ET PROCEDE UTILISANT CELUI-CI POUR IDENTIFIER DES INTERACTIONS ENTRE DES PROTEINES

Publication

EP 1278762 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 01929938 A

Priority

  • IL 0100387 W
  • IL 0000247 W
  • US 22015300 P
  • US 77785601 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0183808A2] A method of identifying interactions between polypeptides is provided. The method is effected by: (a) expressing in a cell substantially lacking Ras activity: (i) a first polynucleotide encoding a first polypeptide being capable of interacting with a plasmalemma of the cell; and (ii) a second polynucleotide encoding a second polypeptide fused to a cytoplasmic Ras mutant, the cytoplasmic Ras mutant being capable of the Ras activity if mobilized to the plasmalemma of the cell; and (b) detecting a presence or absence of the Ras activity in the cell, the Ras activity being indicative of a possible interaction between the first polypeptide and the second polypeptide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/02; C07H 21/04; C12N 15/00; C12N 15/09; C12N 15/63; C12N 15/70; C12N 15/74; C12P 21/06; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/574

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/1055 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [PX] WO 0066707 A2 20001109 - TECHNION RES & DEV FOUNDATION [IL], et al
  • [A] US 5776689 A 19980707 - KARIN MICHAEL [US], et al
  • [XD] BRODER Y C ET AL: "THE RAS RECRUITMENT SYSTEM, A NOVEL APPROACH TO THE STUDY OF PROTEIN-PROTEIN INTERACTIONS", CURRENT BIOLOGY, CURRENT SCIENCE,, GB, vol. 8, no. 20, October 1998 (1998-10-01), pages 1121 - 1124, XP000867036, ISSN: 0960-9822
  • [PX] HUBSMAN M ET AL: "A novel approach for the identification of protein-protein interaction with integral membrane proteins.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH. ENGLAND 15 FEB 2001, vol. 29, no. 4, 15 February 2001 (2001-02-15), pages E18, XP002237898, ISSN: 1362-4962
  • [AD] ARONHEIM A ET AL: "ISOLATION OF AN AP-1 REPRESSOR BY A NOVEL METHOD FOR DETECTING PROTEIN-PROTEIN INTERACTIONS", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, US, vol. 17, no. 6, June 1997 (1997-06-01), pages 3094 - 3102, XP000867026, ISSN: 0270-7306
  • [AD] MENDELSOHN A R ET AL: "PROTEIN INTERACTION METHODS-TOWARD AN ENDGAME", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, vol. 284, 18 June 1999 (1999-06-18), pages 1948 - 1950, XP001028449, ISSN: 0036-8075
  • See also references of WO 0183808A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0183808 A2 20011108; WO 0183808 A3 20020328; AU 5661301 A 20011112; EP 1278762 A2 20030129; EP 1278762 A4 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081101

2007-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060216

2003-06-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021114

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI