Global Patent Index - EP 1280184 B9

EP 1280184 B9 2007-10-03 - Inspecting system for particle-optical imaging of an object, deflection device for charged particles and method for operating the same

Title (en)

Inspecting system for particle-optical imaging of an object, deflection device for charged particles and method for operating the same

Title (de)

Untersuchungssystem zum teilchenoptischen Abbilden eines Objekts, Ablenkvorrichtung für geladene Teilchen sowie Verfahren zum Betrieb derselben

Title (fr)

Système d'inspection d'optique corpusculaire pour l'imagerie d'un objet, dispositif pour la déflection des particules chargées et procédé pour son fonctionnement

Publication

EP 1280184 B9 (DE)

Application

EP 02014643 A

Priority

  • DE 10131931 A
  • DE 10161526 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1280184A2] The system has an illumination device (31) directing energy to the object (3), which produces charged particles, a deflector (23,24) producing a variable deflection field, a position resolving detector (5) and a controller (25) for controlling the illumination device to change the illuminated field position and controlling the first deflector to displace the imaged region (7) on the detector in common with the illuminated field in the object plane. <??>Independent claims are also included for the following: a particle beam deflector and a method of operating a deflector.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/20 (2006.01); H01J 37/28 (2006.01); H01J 31/00 (2006.01); H01J 37/09 (2006.01); H01J 37/12 (2006.01); H01J 37/147 (2006.01); H01J 37/244 (2006.01); H01J 37/285 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 37/28 (2013.01); H01J 2237/082 (2013.01); H01J 2237/2446 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CZ DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1280184 A2 20030129; EP 1280184 A3 20040331; EP 1280184 B1 20070328; EP 1280184 B9 20071003; CZ 20022290 A3 20030212; DE 50209822 D1 20070510; JP 2003068242 A 20030307; JP 4476538 B2 20100609; KR 100920189 B1 20091006; KR 20030004116 A 20030114; TW 579536 B 20040311; US 2003066961 A1 20030410; US 6903337 B2 20050607

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100702

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50209822

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100702

2011-02-28 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100702

2011-02-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110201

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090720

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090730

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20090625

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070328

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071116

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070328

2008-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080102

2007-11-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-11-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: CARL ZEISS SMT AG

- Effective date: 20070905

2007-09-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CARL ZEISS SMT AG

2007-07-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070621

2007-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50209822 P 20070510

2007-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CZ DE FR GB IT NL

2007-03-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050415

2004-12-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CZ DE FR GB IT NL

2004-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01J 37/28 A

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01J 37/285 B

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01J 37/147 B

2003-06-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL ZEISS SMT AG

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-01-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI