Global Patent Index - EP 1280683 B8

EP 1280683 B8 2010-02-17 - SEAT BELT FORCE SENSOR SYSTEM

Title (en)

SEAT BELT FORCE SENSOR SYSTEM

Title (de)

SICHERHEITSGURTSPANNUNGSSENSOREINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE CAPTEUR DE FORCE D'UNE CEINTURE DE SECURITE

Publication

EP 1280683 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 01933223 A

Priority

  • US 0114946 W
  • US 20377800 P
  • US 20750300 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0187676A2] A system for measuring seat belt forces is used to control deployment of vehicle airbags. The system includes a rigid plate member having one end attached to a portion of the seat belt and an opposite end mounted to a vehicle structure. The seat belt is used to secure passengers or an infant car seat to the vehicle seat. A sensor including a strain gage is mounted on the rigid plate between the ends and is used to measure the magnitude of forces exerted on the seat belt by the passenger or car seat. The strain gage generates a signal representative of the tension in the seat belt, which is used to control deployment of the airbag. The airbag is not deployed if the tension in the seat belt exceeds a predetermined limit.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 22/18 (2006.01); B60R 22/48 (2006.01); B60R 21/01 (2006.01); B60R 21/16 (2006.01); B60R 21/33 (2006.01); B60R 22/16 (2006.01); G01L 5/10 (2006.01); B60R 21/015 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60R 21/33 (2013.01); B60R 21/01516 (2014.10); B60R 21/0155 (2014.10); B60R 21/01556 (2014.10); B60R 22/16 (2013.01); B60R 22/18 (2013.01); G01L 5/103 (2013.01); B60R 2022/1806 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0187676 A2 20011122; WO 0187676 A3 20020627; AT 421934 T 20090215; DE 60137571 D1 20090319; EP 1280683 A2 20030205; EP 1280683 B1 20090128; EP 1280683 B8 20100217; JP 2003533399 A 20031111; KR 20030043791 A 20030602; US 2001052696 A1 20011220; US 2004025601 A1 20040212; US 2005082802 A1 20050421; US 2005087026 A1 20050428; US 2007228707 A1 20071004; US 6595545 B2 20030722; US 6860160 B2 20050301; US 7055400 B2 20060606; US 7234729 B2 20070626

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140509

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-03-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60137571

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140509

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60137571

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS, INC. ( N. D. G, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS US, INC., AUBURN HILLS, US

- Document: DE 60137571

- Effective date: 20140317

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS, INC. ( N. D. G, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS US, INC., AUBURN HILLS, MICH., US

- Document: DE 60137571

- Effective date: 20140317

2014-04-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60137571

- Representative's name: FISCHER, MICHAEL, DR., DE

- Effective date: 20140317

2014-03-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60137571

- Representative's name: FISCHER, MICHAEL, DR., DE

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130603

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130531

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090128

2011-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090128

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090509

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090128

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090429

2010-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090509

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091029

2009-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-10-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090128

2009-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090128

2009-09-25 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2009-09-25 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090128

2009-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090629

2009-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090428

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090509

2009-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090128

2009-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090128

2009-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2009-06-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS US, INC.

- Effective date: 20090408

2009-04-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS US, INC.

2009-03-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60137571 P 20090319

2009-02-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2009-01-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2009-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-04-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS VDO AUTOMOTIVE CORPORATION

2003-02-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021104

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR