Global Patent Index - EP 1283289 A3

EP 1283289 A3 2003-06-11 - Method and apparatus for controlling the suction capacitiy of a broken thread suction device in a textile machine

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for controlling the suction capacitiy of a broken thread suction device in a textile machine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Regeln des Saugzugs in einer Fadenbruch-Absauganlage einer Textilmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil de régulation de la capacité d'aspiration d'un dispositif d'aspiration de fils cassés d'une machine textile

Publication

EP 1283289 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02017356 A

Priority

DE 10139077 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1283289A2] Suction yarn break system for a ring spinner/flyer, has a control to set the fan motor speed to correct the suction force on a deviation from a standard level. To control the suction force at the suction yarn break system, for a textile machine, the rotary speed of the fan motor (14) is adjusted. The fan motor speed is set to a normal level, to achieve a given suction. The motor speed is varied from the standard rate, to give and maintain the required suction, when a deviation from the nominal level is detected. The fan motor is set by a control (20), which is linked to sensors (22) at the suction stage (10), and to a signal unit (24).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 5/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 11/00 (2006.01); D01H 5/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/66 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1283289 A2 20030212; EP 1283289 A3 20030611; EP 1283289 B1 20050504; CN 100529213 C 20090819; CN 1405379 A 20030326; DE 10139077 A1 20030220; JP 2003096628 A 20030403; JP 4377113 B2 20091202; US 2003037532 A1 20030227; US 6865780 B2 20050315

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170831

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170817

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-06-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER AND PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANW, CH

2014-06-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ZHUOLANG TEXTILE MACHINERY CO. LTD., CN

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SAURER GMBH AND CO. KG, DE

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071016

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-04-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060207

2005-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50202976 P 20050609

2005-06-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-05-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2003-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-02-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI