Global Patent Index - EP 1283558 A3

EP 1283558 A3 2009-02-25 - A fuel cell stack and a method of operating the same

Title (en)

A fuel cell stack and a method of operating the same

Title (de)

Brennstofzellenstapel und Betriebsverfahren dafür

Title (fr)

Assemblage de piles à combustible et son procédé de fonctionement

Publication

EP 1283558 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02016122 A

Priority

JP 2001229848 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1283558A2] A plurality of fuel cells (12) are stacked together. Current collectors (14a, 14b) are stacked on the fuel cells (12) at opposite ends in a stacking direction of said fuel cells (12), and heating members (16a, 16b) are stacked on the outside of said current collectors (14a, 14b). In a normal operating condition, electricity is delivered through the current collectors (14a, 14b). When the temperature of end cells (12a, 12b) is lowered, a switching operation is performed to stop delivering electricity through the current collectors (14a, 14b) and start delivering electricity through the heating members (16a, 16b).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01M 8/04 (2006.01); H01M 8/10 (2006.01); H01M 8/02 (2006.01); H01M 8/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01M 8/04731 (2013.01); H01M 8/0228 (2013.01); H01M 8/0247 (2013.01); H01M 8/0267 (2013.01); H01M 8/04007 (2013.01); H01M 8/04074 (2013.01); H01M 8/04268 (2013.01); H01M 8/04365 (2013.01); H01M 8/04664 (2013.01); H01M 8/04671 (2013.01); H01M 8/241 (2013.01); H01M 8/2483 (2016.02); H01M 8/04037 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1283558 A2 20030212; EP 1283558 A3 20090225; CA 2396322 A1 20030130; CA 2396322 C 20061003; JP 2003045462 A 20030214; JP 4303899 B2 20090729; US 2003022046 A1 20030130; US 6953632 B2 20051011

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-20 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150408

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2009-06-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090424

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01M 8/04 20060101AFI20021211BHEP

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01M 8/24 20060101ALI20090122BHEP

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01M 8/02 20060101ALI20090122BHEP

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-02-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI